Human Rights and Opportunities et al v. Portland et al
Plaintiff: Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities, ex rel. Cathy O'Keefe and Richard O'Keefe, Cathy O'Keefe, Richard O'Keefe and Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Defendant: Town of Portland and Portland Zoning Board of Appeals
Case Number: 3:2019cv01178
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Strike #29 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Cathy O'Keefe.Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses)(Labrencis, Jessica)
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Labrencis, Jessica)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The #31 motion for extension is DENIED. This is the fifth motion for extension of time the Defendant has filed with respect to this set of interrogatories and requests for production. In the 26 order, the Court advised the Defendant that further extensions of this deadline would be unlikely. Moreover, the Court notes that this motion for extension was filed on the same day as the deadline. Motions for extension should be filed at least three days before the deadline sought to be extended, and motions filed after that date should set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three days before the deadline sought to be extended. See Local Rule 7(b)(3). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/10/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 9, 2019 to Respond to Intervening Plaintff's 1st Set of Discovery by Town of Portland. (Gerarde, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The #28 Motion for Extension is GRANTED. In light of Defendant's #29 Answer, the #27 Motion for Default Entry is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/3/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Town of Portland.(Gerarde, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2019 to File a Response to the Intervening Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Town of Portland. (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendant Town of Portland by Cathy O'Keefe, Richard O'Keefe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Motion for Entry of Default)(Labrencis, Jessica)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The #24 motion for extension is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Defendant shall have until September 9, 2019 to answer, object or otherwise respond to the intervening plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. As this is the fourth extension of time the Defendant has filed with respect to this set of interrogatories and requests for production, further extensions of this deadline are unlikely. The Defendant shall have until October 2, 2019 to answer, object or otherwise respond to the intervening plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/29/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The #23 motion is GRANTED. Intervening Plaintiff shall have until October 2, 2019 to respond to Defendant Town of Portland's July 11, 2019 First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/29/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 2, 2019 to Answer Intervening Plaintiffs' First and Second Sets of Interrogatories and Requests for Production 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Town of Portland. (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 2, 2019 To Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests by Cathy O'Keefe, Richard O'Keefe. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Richard O'Keefe by Cathy O'Keefe. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 22, 2019 Case MMX-CV17-6017460 remanded to State Court Judicial District of Middlesex at Middletown. (Johnson, D.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Leigh Labrencis on behalf of Cathy O'Keefe, Richard O'Keefe (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A. Sharp on behalf of Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities (Sharp, Cheryl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle DumasKeuler on behalf of Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities (DumasKeuler, Michelle)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The #9 motion for extension is GRANTED. In addition, the parties shall file a statement in accordance with Local Rule 26(f) by September 13, 2019.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The #16 motion to remand is GRANTED. Case MMX-CV17-6017460 is hereby remanded to the Judicial District of Middlesex at Middletown. The notice of removal sets forth a basis for federal court jurisdiction as to case MMX-CV18-6019516, however, and this case shall not be remanded.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Richard OKeefe and Kathy OKeefe v. Portland Zoning Board of Appeals, No. MMX-CV-17-6017460-S) by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals.Responses due by 8/29/2019 (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2019 (Johnson, D.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendant Town of Portland filed a #1 notice of removal seeking to remove two state court actions (MMX-CV17-6017460 and MMX-CV18-6019516) to this Court. Defendant shall show cause by August 9, 2019, why the Court should not remand the case brought against the Zoning Board of Appeals (Case Number MMX-CV17-6017460), which does not appear to set forth a basis for federal court jurisdiction. Any response should also cite authority for the proposition that a case that sets forth no basis for federal jurisdiction may nonetheless be removed because it is somehow related to a separate case that does set forth such a basis. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/2/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 08/01/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Portland, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Town of Portland, #9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 1, 2019 to Answer Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Town of Portland, #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Portland, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Town of Portland, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Portland, #4 Jury Demand filed by Town of Portland, #12 Protective Order, #8 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Portland, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Town of Portland Signed by Clerk on 08/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/31/2019. (Peterson, M)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/31/2019.(Peterson, M)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2019. Discovery due by 1/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/31/2019. (Peterson, M)
July 31, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 1, 2019 to Answer Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Town of Portland. (Hushin, Z.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals re #1 Notice of Removal, (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b)) (Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals re #1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance With Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Portland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Portland. (Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kontyko on behalf of Portland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Portland (Kontyko, Kaitlin) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Portland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Portland (Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals from JD of Middlesex at Middletown, case number MMX CV 18 6019516S & MMX-CV17-6017460-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5381395, filed by Town of Portland, Portland Zoning Board of Appeals.(Gerarde, Thomas) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights and Opportunities et al v. Portland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities, ex rel. Cathy O'Keefe and Richard O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy O'Keefe
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Labrencis
Represented By: Melissa S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard O'Keefe
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Labrencis
Represented By: Melissa S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sharp
Represented By: Michelle DumasKeuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Portland
Represented By: Kaitlin Kontyko
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Kaitlin Kontyko
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?