Montgomery v. Stanley Black & Decker Inc.
Plaintiff: William Montgomery
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01182
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael B. Shortnacy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5456671) by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Canty, Kaitlin)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Attorney Michael B. Shortnacy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2019. (Bozek, M.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Stanley Black & Decker Inc.Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery)(Canty, Kaitlin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Stanley Black & Decker Inc.Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit D to Memorandum, #6 Exhibit E to Memorandum, #7 Declaration of Susan H. Wolf, #8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Susan H. Wolf, #9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Susan H. Wolf, #10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Susan H. Wolf)(Williams, Paul)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael B. Shortnacy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5456671) by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael B. Shortnacy in Support of Motion for Admission as Visiting Attorney)(Williams, Paul)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the plaintiff's #22 motion for extension of time. The court grants the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to move for class certification. The time for the plaintiff to move for class certification is hereby extended to and including October 15, 2019. The court denies, without predjudice, the motion for an extension of time to oppose the defendant's not yet filed motion to dismiss. The parties may file a motion for an extension of time, in accordance with the applicable rules and if necessary, after the scheduling order enters in this case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/9/2019. (Sondergeld, C.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to move for class certification and to oppose Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss by William Montgomery. (Deckant, Neal)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred V. Covello for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/28/2019. (Shafer, J.)
August 22, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Stanley Black & Decker Inc. to 9/25/2019 per Dkt. 20 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint #1 . The responsive pleading shall be due 09/25/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/22/2019.(Diamond, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Cerreta, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Williams on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Williams, Paul)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2019 to file a responsive pleading, including motions, to the Complaint #1 Complaint by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Canty, Kaitlin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Canty, Kaitlin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin A Canty on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Canty, Kaitlin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Montgomery. Stanley Black & Decker Inc served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Deckant, Neal)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal J. Deckant on behalf of William Montgomery (Deckant, Neal)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick John Klorczyk, III on behalf of William Montgomery (Klorczyk, Frederick)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neal J. Deckant to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5394672) by William Montgomery. (Reardon, James)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frederick Klorczyk. Signed by Clerk on 08/05/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Frederick Klorczyk to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5383594) by William Montgomery. (Reardon, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Stanley Black & Decker Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James J. Reardon, Jr* *Reardon Scanlon LLP* *45 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Velez, F.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William Montgomery, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019; Discovery due by 1/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 1, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
August 1, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Reardon, James) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanley Black & Decker Inc.( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5382544.), filed by William Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reardon, James) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Stanley Black & Decker Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Montgomery
Represented By: James J. Reardon, Jr
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker Inc
Represented By: Paul D. Williams
Represented By: Kaitlin A Canty
Represented By: John W Cerreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?