American Select Insurance Company v. Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC

Plaintiff: American Select Insurance Company
Defendant: Saputo Dairy Foods USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01188
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 Case electronically transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-01975.
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 Transfer Letter to the USDC for the District of Connecticut. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the USDC for the District of Connecticut. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/1/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to US District for the District of Connecticut by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #20 Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/19/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Paper (Bell, Colin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edmund Perry. Directing attorney Edmund Perry to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas J Underwood. Directing attorney Thomas J Underwood to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #16 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Paper filed by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/11/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Paper (Bell, Colin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Select Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Farmers Insurance Company for American Select Insurance Company.(Stravitz, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edmund Perry (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8113247.) by American Select Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Underwood, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8113233.) by American Select Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal in Response to Standing Order (Bell, Colin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Saputo Cheese USA, Inc. for Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC.(Bell, Colin)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/5/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC was filed incorrectly. Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR FREDERICK COUNTY. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to All Adverse Parties of Removal and of Filing a Copy of Such Notice In State Court by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Request for Production of Documents by American Select Insurance Company (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interrogatories by American Select Insurance Company (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC, filed by American Select Insurance Company.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5 Certifcate(Bell, Colin)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC (Bell, Colin) Modified on 7/8/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Frederick County Circuit Court, case number C-10-CV-19-000433. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8107910), filed by Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Writ of Summons, #5 Exhibit 4 - Interrgoatories, #6 Exhibit 5 - Requests for Production, #7 28 USC S.-1446(d) Certificate of Notice to Adverse Parties)(Bell, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Select Insurance Company v. Saputo Dairy Foods, USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Select Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saputo Dairy Foods USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?