Doyle v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Patrick Doyle
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01192
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with N by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company.(Fineman, Beck)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Hickey on behalf of Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company (Hickey, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company (Fineman, Beck)
August 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company to 8/28/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS & COMPLAINT served on BECK FINEMAN on 08/07/2019, filed by Patrick Doyle. (Kantor, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven Lawrence Kantor* *The Kantor Law Firm, PLLC* *5800 Main Street* *Williamsville, NY 14221*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Patrick Doyle, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 08/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 5, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (Kantor, Steven)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/02/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/02/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Discovery due by 2/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/02/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 2, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5384415.), filed by Patrick Doyle.(Kantor, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Represented By: Robert O. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Doyle
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?