Collins et al v. Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Denise Collins and Peter Collins
Defendant: Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C., Mark J Alonso, William C Reddy and David Curran
Case Number: 3:2019cv01194
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Denise Collins, Peter Collins SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/23/2019.(Lewis, D)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying without prejudice to renew #14 Motion to Appear, for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(a)-stating the proposed visiting attorneys office address, telephone number, fax number, and e-mail address; and Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(d)-stating that said attorney has fully reviewed and is familiar with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/22/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Denise Collins, Peter Collins (Votre, Kenneth)
August 22, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Mark J Alonso to 9/9/2019; Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C. to 9/9/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2019 Respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/22/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Manoj R. Andalkar, Mark J. Alonso to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5408323) by Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Manoj R. Andalkar, #2 Affidavit Mark J. Alonso)(Bjorkman, Ian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2019 Respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C.. (Bjorkman, Ian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian E. Bjorkman on behalf of Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C. (Bjorkman, Ian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Conway on behalf of David Curran, William C Reddy (Conway, John)
August 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for David Curran to 9/9/2019; William C Reddy to 9/9/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/8/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading by David Curran, William C Reddy. (Ringold, James)
August 5, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2019 (Lewis, D)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by David Curran, William C Reddy, #2 Notice (Other) filed by David Curran, William C Reddy, #3 Notice (Other) filed by David Curran, William C Reddy, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019 Discovery due by 2/1/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2020 Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 2, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by David Curran, William C Reddy OF NO PENDING MOTIONS IN STATE COURT (Ringold, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by David Curran, William C Reddy STATEMENT PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER IN REMOVED CASES (Ringold, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Curran, William C Reddy from Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV19-6087979-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5384737, filed by David Curran, William C Reddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court Summons and Complaint))(Ringold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Collins
Represented By: Kenneth A. Votre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Collins
Represented By: Kenneth A. Votre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonso, Andalkar & Facher, P.C.
Represented By: Ian E. Bjorkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C Reddy
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Represented By: John F. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Curran
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Represented By: John F. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?