Lafreniere v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Robert Lafreniere
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01215
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Hickey on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Hickey, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Fineman, Beck)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Metro-North Railroad Company waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/6/2019 filed by Robert Lafreniere. (Cahill, George)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Metro-North Railroad Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *George J. Cahill, Jr.* *Cahill & Perry, P.C* *43 Trumbull St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Robert Lafreniere, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 08/07/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 08/06/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2019 Discovery due by 2/5/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2020 Signed by Clerk on 08/06/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Metro-North Railroad Company. (Cahill, George)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5388697.), filed by Robert Lafreniere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cahill, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafreniere v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Represented By: Robert O. Hickey
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lafreniere
Represented By: George J. Cahill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?