USA v. Irish Sport Horse Named Cinda et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Irish Sport Horse Named Cinda
Claimant: Belle Zachary
Case Number: 3:2019cv01218
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 09/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Turbert, Julie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The #7 stipulated forfeiture agreement, as modified by the #8 stipulation, is hereby APPROVED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/1/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #7 Stipulation by USA, Belle Zachary. (Turbert, Julie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by USA, Belle Zachary. (Turbert, Julie)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. All further pleadings or documents in this matter should be filed with the Clerk's office in Hartford and bear the docket number 3:19-cv-01218-MPS. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/8/2019.(Pipech, L.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #3 Standing Protective Order, #2 Warrant Issued Signed by Clerk on 08/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/7/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Issued (Reis, Julia)
August 7, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint of Forfeiture against Irish Sport Horse Named Cinda, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Turbert, Julie) Modified on 8/7/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Irish Sport Horse Named Cinda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irish Sport Horse Named Cinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Belle Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?