SLG Systems, Inc. v. FGO Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: SLG Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Garcia Deliveries LLC f/k/a FGO Deliveries LLC d/b/a FGO Logistics, Defendant FGO Delivers LLC d/b/a FGO Logistics, FGO Logistics LLC d/b/a FGO Logistics, FGO Logistics LLC, FGO Delivers LLC and Garcia Deliveries LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01251
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against SLG Systems, Inc. by Garcia Deliveries LLC, FGO Delivers LLC, FGO Logistics LLC.(Gallanty, Alan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Gallanty on behalf of FGO Delivers LLC, FGO Logistics LLC, Garcia Deliveries LLC (Gallanty, Alan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SLG Systems, Inc.. Garcia Deliveries LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Fisher, Sean)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SLG Systems, Inc.. FGO Delivers LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fisher, Sean)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SLG Systems, Inc.. FGO Logistics LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Fisher, Sean)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *FGO Delivers LLC, FGO Logistics LLC, Garcia Deliveries LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sean M. Fisher* *Brenner, Saltzman & Wallman* *271 Whitney Avenue* *New Haven, CT 06511-1746*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Fisher, Sean)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SLG Systems, Inc.. (Fisher, Sean)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by SLG Systems, Inc., #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2019. Discovery due by 2/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 9, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5394350.), filed by SLG Systems, Inc..(Fisher, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLG Systems, Inc. v. FGO Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia Deliveries LLC f/k/a FGO Deliveries LLC d/b/a FGO Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant FGO Delivers LLC d/b/a FGO Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGO Logistics LLC d/b/a FGO Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGO Logistics LLC
Represented By: Alan Gallanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGO Delivers LLC
Represented By: Alan Gallanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia Deliveries LLC
Represented By: Alan Gallanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLG Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?