Rosen v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Sean Rosen
Defendant: Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo, LLC, 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC and Aearo Intermediate, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01253
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:19-cv-03356, filed 08/29/2019. (Anastasio, F.)
August 29, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 29, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the District of Florida Northern. (Anastasio, F.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District Court for the Northern District of Florida. signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. 3M Company served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo Intermediate, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo Holding LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. 3M Occupational Safety LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly E. Reardon* *The Reardon Law Firm P.C.* *160 Hempstead Street* *New London, CT 06320*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Sean Rosen, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC. (Reardon, Kelly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5394941.), filed by Sean Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reardon, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosen v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Occupational Safety LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Rosen
Represented By: Kelly E. Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?