Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council et al v. Connecticut Transit et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Henry, Albert Antonio, Alfred Barnes, Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council and Robert Taylor
Defendant: H.N.S. Management Company, Inc. and Connecticut Transit
Case Number: 3:2019cv01254
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5467135) by Albert Antonio, Alfred Barnes, Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council, Calvin Henry, Robert Taylor. Motions referred to Robert A. Richardson(Adler, Gregg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses of Defendant H.N.S. Management Company, Inc. by H.N.S. Management Company, Inc..(Murray, Hugh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 1/8/2020 at 4:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER:The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #12 and sets the following case management deadlines in light of the parties' expectations that all material facts will be subject to stipulation. If that is not the case, the parties shall notify the Court and seek an amended scheduling order by November 10, 2019. Amended pleadings are due by October 15, 2019. A discovery status teleconference will take place on January 8, 2020 at 4:00 pm. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be complete by February 28, 2020. All dispositive motions are due by December 2, 2019. The JTM is due by August 2, 2020, and a bench trial will take place in the month of September 2020 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the bench trial is scheduled to take place.The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #5 --including the deadlines and format of filings--when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than two weeks before the month of trial. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 First REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Murray, Hugh)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to H.N.S. Management Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/13/2019 filed by Albert Antonio; Alfred Barnes; Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council; Calvin Henry; Robert Taylor. (Adler, Gregg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh F. Murray, III on behalf of H.N.S. Management Company, Inc. (Murray, Hugh)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/15/2019. (Shafer, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Connecticut Transit, H.N.S. Management Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregg D. Adler* *Livingston, Adler, Pulda, Meiklejohn & Kelly* *557 Prospect Ave.* *Hartford, CT 06105-2922*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Calvin Henry, Albert Antonio, Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council, Alfred Barnes, Robert Taylor, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order For Fair Labor Standards Act Cases Not Pleaded as Collective Actions Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery, #2 Initial Discovery Attachment)(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
August 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Connecticut Transit, H.N.S. Management Company, Inc.. (Adler, Gregg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connecticut Transit, H.N.S. Management Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5395250.), filed by Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council, Alfred Barnes, Albert Antonio, Robert Taylor, Calvin Henry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit A)(Adler, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council et al v. Connecticut Transit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Henry
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Antonio
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Barnes
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Joint Bargaining Council
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.N.S. Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh F. Murray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?