Rivera v. Trinh
Plaintiff: Carmelo Rivera
Defendant: Jonathan Trinh
Case Number: 3:2019cv01257
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER:(Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 04:30 PM before Judge Michael P. Shea, Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019, Discovery due by 8/1/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2020, Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2020, Joint Trial Brief due by 10/1/2020), Answer deadline updated for Jonathan Trinh to 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/1/19.(Johnson, D.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Jonathan Trinh.(Keefe, Hugh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Popilowski on behalf of Jonathan Trinh (Popilowski, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh F. Keefe on behalf of Jonathan Trinh (Keefe, Hugh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmelo Rivera. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Marshal Return)(Williams, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jonathan Trinh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Peterson, M)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Carmelo Rivera, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Carmelo Rivera Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Peterson, M)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/12/2019.(Peterson, M)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 12, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Williams, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Carmelo Rivera (Williams, John) Modified party on 8/12/2019 (Anastasio, F.).
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Trinh ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5395444.), filed by Carmelo Rivera.(Williams, John) Modified party on 8/12/2019 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Trinh
Represented By: Matthew D Popilowski
Represented By: Hugh F. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelo Rivera
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?