Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Dabate et al
Plaintiff: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Richard G. Dabate, Jr. and Cara S. Richert
Case Number: 3:2019cv01258
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against Aetna Life Insurance Company by Cara S. Richert.(Conti, Richard)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cara S. Richert waiver sent on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Bennici, Gregory)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Richard G. Dabate, Jr, Cara S. Richert* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory J. Bennici* *Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford* *1055 Washington Boulevard 9th Floor* *Stamford, CT 06901-2249*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Cara S. Richert, #7 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Conti on behalf of Cara S. Richert (Conti, Richard)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 12, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
August 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Bennici, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Bennici, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5395779.), filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennici, Gregory) Modified on 8/12/2019 to correct filed against parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Dabate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Dabate, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara S. Richert
Represented By: Richard S. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?