Zaitz Overland, LLC v. Image Aviation Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zaitz Overland, LLC
Defendant: Image Aviation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01261
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Case remanded to Judicial District of CT Superior Court, Judicial District of Ansonia-Milford at Milford, CT. (Lewis, D)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. In light of the remand of this matter to state court (Doc. #15 ), the telephonic status conference scheduled for August 15, 2019, at 2:30PM is CANCELED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2019. (Katz, S.)
August 14, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REMAND TO STATE COURT: granting #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. For the reasons set forth herein, and in plaintiffs Motion (Doc. #12 ), the Motion for Remand is hereby GRANTED and this matter is hereby REMANDED to the Connecticut Superior Court. While the court is aware of plaintiffs request to require the payment of costs and fees pursuant to section 1447(c) of title28 of the United States Code, the court declines to exercise its discretion to order costs in this case. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c); Martin v. Franklin Capital Corp., 546 U.S. 132, 136 (2005) (explaining that [s]ection 1447(c)... provides that a remand order may require payment of attorney's fees and the word may clearly connotes discretion.) (internal citation and quotation marks omitted). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/14/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Motion For Remand To State Court and Joint Request To Mark Off Magistrate Telephone Status Conference filed by Image Aviation Services, Inc.. (Arnold, Steven)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/15/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. Please use the following dial-in for this conference: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss all pending motions during this conference, including the motion for remand. (Caffrey, A.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Zaitz Overland, LLC.Responses due by 9/4/2019 (Connor, Colin)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for motion including #5 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/14/2019.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Lewis, D)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Image Aviation Services, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Image Aviation Services, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Image Aviation Services, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Image Aviation Services, Inc., #5 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy filed by Zaitz Overland, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #9 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2019 Discovery due by 2/12/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020 Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 13, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy pending in state court at time of removal by Zaitz Overland, LLC. (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Image Aviation Services, Inc. Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Arnold, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Image Aviation Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Arnold, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of Image Aviation Services, Inc. (Arnold, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Image Aviation Services, Inc. from CT Superior Court, Judicial District of Ansonia-Milford at Milford, CT, case number ANN-CV19-5017947-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5396633, filed by Image Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Arnold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaitz Overland, LLC v. Image Aviation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaitz Overland, LLC
Represented By: Colin B. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image Aviation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?