Baugh v. Medicredit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles Baugh, III
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01262
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Charles Baugh, III (Leavitt, Rosanne)
October 9, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/17/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/8/19. (Tooker, A.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 17, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Medicredit, Inc.. (Cardin, Kelly)
September 18, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Medicredit, Inc. to 10/3/2019. (Barry, Donna)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Response to Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/3/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/18/19. (Tooker, A.)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 3, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Medicredit, Inc.. (Cardin, Kelly)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Baugh, III. Medicredit, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Leavitt, Rosanne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Medicredit, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Rosanne Ciardiello Leavitt* *Law Office of Rosanne Ciardiello Leavitt* *19 Wamsutta Drive* *North Attleboro, MA 02760*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Charles Baugh, III, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/13/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/13/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2019 Discovery due by 2/12/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020 Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 13, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
August 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Medicredit, Inc.. (Leavitt, Rosanne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medicredit, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5397234.), filed by Charles Baugh, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 30, 2019 Medicredit letter, #2 Exhibit B - May 8, 2019 Medicredit letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leavitt, Rosanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baugh v. Medicredit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Baugh, III
Represented By: Rosanne Ciardiello Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Marie Cardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?