In re: Ilako
Interested Party: Yolanda Ownens Ilako
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
In Re: Yolando Owens Ilako
Appellant: Ann Blackwell
Appellee: Bonnie Mangan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01271
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On September 9, 2019, the court entered an Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. 7) to the appellant why this case should not be dismissed for failure to timely file an appeal and failure to file a designation and statement. Show cause response date was September 27, 2019. The appellant having not responded to the courts Order by September 27, 2019, and no request for an extension of time having been filed, it is hereby ordered that the case is dismissed for failure to comply with the Courts Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/8/2019.(DeRubeis, B.)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/9/2019. (Reis, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed (RE:) 19 Notice of Appeal to District Court Filed by Ann L. Blackwell, Defendant. 15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Appellant, Ann Blackwell. Appellee(s), Bonnie C. Mangan, Trustee. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 8/23/2019. Transmission of Designation due by 9/9/2019 filed by Defendant Ann L. Blackwell. (Fanelle, N.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/15/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/15/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/15/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 12-21517 17-02028, filed by Ann Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Order #15) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Ilako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Yolanda Ownens Ilako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Yolando Owens Ilako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ann Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bonnie Mangan
Represented By: Bonnie C. Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?