Bertoldi v. J.A. Cambece Law Ofc, PC et al
Plaintiff: Kristine Bertoldi
Defendant: Craig Madden and J.A. Cambece Law Ofc, PC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01274
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Approved. So ORDERED re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kristine Bertoldi. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/3/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Kristine Bertoldi (Faulkner, Joanne)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Kristine Bertoldi Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for all pretrial matters excluding trial, unless the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/16/2019.(Pipech, L.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/15/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/15/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2019. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/15/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 15, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5400822.), filed by Kristine Bertoldi.(Faulkner, Joanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertoldi v. J.A. Cambece Law Ofc, PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Bertoldi
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Cambece Law Ofc, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?