In re: Magda
Appellant: Kenneth R Magda
Appellee: Town of Beacon Falls
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
Interested Party: Roberta Napolitano
Case Number: 3:2019cv01287
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Docket Entry Correction re #15 Judgment, modified to correct pdf. (Lewis, D)
September 20, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Town of Beacon Falls against Kenneth R Magda, in accordance with the court's Order and the case is closed.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2019.(Lewis, D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #1 Corrected PDF) (Lewis, D).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER terminating as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss, based upon #12 Appellant's Consent to Town of Beacon Falls Motion to Dismiss; terminating #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/20/2019. (Lewis, D) Modified on 9/20/2019 (Lewis, D). Modified on 9/20/2019 (Lewis, D).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Appellant's Consent to Town of Beacon Falls Motion to Dismiss and Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by Kenneth R Magda SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/20/2019.(Lewis, D)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #11 Order to Show Cause, #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended to add Exhibit A) by Kenneth R Magda filed by Kenneth R Magda. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Tzepos, George)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/6/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed 19-1287 (JCH) (RE:) 57 Notice of Appeal to District Court 45 Memorandum of Decision and Order, 46 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay Filed by George C. Tzepos on behalf of Kenneth R. Magda, Debtor. Appellant, Kenneth R. Magda. Appellee(s), Town of Beacon Falls. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 09/3/2019. Transmission of Designation due by 09/18/2019 filed by Debtor Kenneth R. Magda. (Fanelle, N.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended to add Exhibit A) by Town of Beacon Falls.Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Docket Case No. 18-30731)(Gulliver, Carl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Town of Beacon Falls. (Gulliver, Carl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Town of Beacon Falls.Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Gulliver, Carl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl T. Gulliver on behalf of Town of Beacon Falls (Gulliver, Carl)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 18-30731, filed by Kenneth R Magda. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum #45, #2 Order #46) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Magda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth R Magda
Represented By: George C. Tzepos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Town of Beacon Falls
Represented By: Carl T. Gulliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roberta Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?