Quiroz Peraza v. G & M Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Oscar Quiroz Peraza
Defendant: G & M Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01298
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Answer deadline updated for G & M Management, LLC to 11/15/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time until November 15, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/17/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint by G & M Management, LLC. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian K. Gunningsmith on behalf of G & M Management, LLC (Gunningsmith, Damian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *G & M Management, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Bhandary-Alexander* *New Haven Legal Assistance Assoc. Inc.* *426 State Street* *New Haven, CT 06510-2018*. (Freberg, B)
September 11, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to G & M Management, LLC. (Bhandary-Alexander, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Oscar Quiroz Peraza, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Oscar Quiroz Peraza, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2019. (Reis, Julia)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2019 Discovery due by 2/20/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2020 Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bhandary-Alexander on behalf of Oscar Quiroz Peraza (Bhandary-Alexander, James)
August 21, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G & M Management, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5407622.), filed by Oscar Quiroz Peraza.(Bhandary-Alexander, James) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroz Peraza v. G & M Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & M Management, LLC
Represented By: Damian K. Gunningsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Quiroz Peraza
Represented By: James Bhandary-Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?