Connecticut General Life Insurance Company et al v. New Method Wellness, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company and Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: New Method Wellness, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01301
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fazekas, J.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Kang, Edward)
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' (1) Request for Production of Documents and (2) Request for Special Interrogatories to 60 days from the date of service of Plaintiffs Discovery. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/21/2019. (Leon, Noel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 35 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days from service of Request for Production of Documents and Special Interrogatories by New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garner, Craig)
November 29, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Protective Order by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company.Responses due by 12/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Protective Order)(Kang, Edward)
November 29, 2019 Filing 33 Joint STIPULATION Regarding the Collection and Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Kang, Edward)
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appendix of Non-Published Authorities)(Garner, Craig)
October 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER (see attached order):Initial Disclosures by 1/1/2019.Motion to Amend Complaint due by 11/15/2019.Joinder of Additional Parties by 12/13/2019.Damages Analysis by 12/13/20191.Fact Discovery completed by 9/25/2020. Disclosure of Experts on any issue on which party bears burden of proof by 10/30/2020.Depositions of such Experts by 11/27/2020.Disclosure of Experts on any issue on which party does not bear burden of proof by 1/8/2021.Depositions of such Experts by 2/12/2021. Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2021. Joint Trial Memorandum due by 5/28/2021.Trial Ready Date 7/5/2021.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/28/2019. (Leon, Noel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2019. Total Time: 4 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini) (Leon, Noel).
October 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. 26(f) Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Deadlines)(Kang, Edward)
October 18, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Kang, Edward)
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Kingsbery on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company (Kingsbery, Kelsey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily S Costin on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company (Costin, Emily)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by New Method Wellness, Inc..Responses due by 10/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Appendix)(Garner, Craig)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Kelsey L. Kingsbery to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Perez, J.)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Emily S. Costin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Perez, J.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kelsey L. Kingsbery to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5454761) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kelsey L. Kingsbery in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Kelsey L. Kingsbery - Certificates of Good Standing)(Kang, Edward)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Emily S. Costin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5454759) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily S. Costin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Emily S. Costin - Certificates of Good Standing)(Kang, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Answer deadline updated for New Method Wellness, Inc. to 9/30/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/17/2019. (Leon, Noel)
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019 (Perez, J.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 Complaint, by New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Radshaw, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Boyd Garner on behalf of New Method Wellness, Inc. (Garner, Craig)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig B. Garner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5430118) by New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Radshaw, John)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig B. Garner. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/10/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Radshaw, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig B. Garner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5430118) by New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Craig B. Garner)(Radshaw, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Radshaw, III on behalf of New Method Wellness, Inc. (Radshaw, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. New Method Wellness, Inc. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Kang, Edward)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *New Method Wellness, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Edward T. Kang* *Alston & Bird LLP- DC* *950 F Street, NW* *Washington, DC 2004-1404*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Edward T. Kang on behalf of Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, #1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/22/2019 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/22/2019 to correct file date(Fazekas, J.).
August 21, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Life Insurance Company for Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Kang, Edward)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connecticut General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Kang, Edward)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. Kang on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company (Kang, Edward)
August 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New Method Wellness, Inc.. (Kang, Edward)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Method Wellness, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-5408434.), filed by Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kang, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company et al v. New Method Wellness, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Method Wellness, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: Craig Boyd Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward T. Kang
Represented By: Kelsey Kingsbery
Represented By: Emily S Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward T. Kang
Represented By: Kelsey Kingsbery
Represented By: Emily S Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?