Savvidis v. McQuaid et al

Plaintiff: Sophia Savvidis
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc and Richard McQuaid
Case Number: 3:2019cv01308
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Sophia Savvidis, #2 Notice (Other), #10 Electronic Filing Order, 11 Interdistrict - Pending Motions, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2019 Discovery due by 2/22/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2020 Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06822.
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terminating #6 Motion for Extension of Time. On August 16, 2019," after the Court had transferred this case, the Court received plaintiffs request for a 30-day extension to file its statement. Dkt. 6. The Court has reviewed plaintiff's request for extension and the justifications for keeping this litigation in this District explained therein. Even if plaintiff's request for extension had been timely made, the Court would have reached the same conclusion as to the merits of transferring the case. Thus, for the reasons set out in the Court's prior orders, Dkts. 4, 5, the Court reaffirms its Order of earlier today transferring this litigation to the District of Connecticut. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/16/2019) (cf) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 16, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut (jwh)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: #4 Order to Show Cause: On July 24, 2019, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause, explaining that-due to the domiciles of the parties, the location of the disputed property, and "in the interest of justice"- the Court was inclined to transfer the case to the District of Connecticut. Dkt. 4. The Court directed plaintiff to file a letter addressing whether the case should be transferred to the District of Connecticut by August 14, 2019, and made clear that "[i]f plaintiff does not file such a statement by August 14, 2019, the Court will transfer this case to the District of Connecticut under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Id. Plaintiff has not filed such a statement. The Clerk of Court is therefore respectfully directed to transfer this litigation the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/15/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Document filed by Sophia Savvidis. (vn)
July 25, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Show Cause, to Sophia Savvidis 106 A Comstock Hill Avenue Norwalk, CT 06850. (aea)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's Complaint makes clear that the subject property is located in Connecticut, where both plaintiff and McQuaid reside. For these reasons, and "in the interest of justice," the Court is inclined to transfer this case to the District of Connecticut. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Plaintiff is therefore directed to file on the docket of this case, by August 14, 2019, a brief letter of not more than 3 single-spaced pages addressing whether this case should be transferred to the District of Connecticut. Plaintiff may consider discussing such factors as the convenience of the witnesses and parties, the location of documents, and the weight that should be afforded to the plaintiff's choice of filing in this judicial district. If plaintiff does not file such a statement by August 14, 2019, the Court will transfer this case to the District of Connecticut under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)... The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff and the address on file. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/24/2019) (rj) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Country Wide Home Loans, Inc., Richard McQuaid. (sac)
July 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
July 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Country Wide Home Loans, Inc., Richard McQuaid. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465407017274) Document filed by Sophia Savvidis. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savvidis v. McQuaid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Savvidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?