Hagwood-EL v. Allied Interstate
Plaintiff: Mechonna Hagwood and Mechonna Hagwood-EL
Defendant: Allied Interstate, Home Depot, Inc., Automatic Data Processing and Ascendium Education Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv01311
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Aiello on behalf of Ascendium Education Group (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aiello, Jacqueline)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, Ascendium Education Group, Automatic Data Processing, Home Depot, Inc., filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Freberg, B)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Automatic Data Processing waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/17/2019 filed by Automatic Data Processing. (Jarem, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Nicholas Jarem on behalf of Automatic Data Processing (Jarem, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Shea on behalf of Automatic Data Processing (Shea, James)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINTS (Doc. #16 and #17). Plaintiff has for the second time filed a series of three amended complaints. The Court accepted one of these amended complaints for filing (Doc. #15), but plaintiff proceeded to file two more despite the Court's previous order that plaintiff assemble a single document that contains all of her factual allegations and that includes any appended exhibits (Doc. #12). Each of these documents is different, and the Court is unclear which of the documents plaintiff intends to serve as the operative complaint in this case. Plaintiff should review what she has filed, assemble a single document that contains all of her factual allegations and that includes any appended exhibits, and then file this document and any exhibits as her amended complaint not later than October 15, 2019. The Court again reminds plaintiff of the requirement that she allege a plain and simple statement in the body of the complaint of the grounds for her causes of action in compliance with the Court's order to show cause (Doc. #8) and that describes what each named defendant did wrong that makes the named defendant liable to plaintiff. If plaintiff does not file a complaint that complies with the Court's order to show cause (Doc. #8), the Court is likely to dismiss this action. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/3/2019. (Al-Jarani, Y.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Home Depot, Inc. waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/17/2019 filed by Home Depot, Inc.. (Minchella, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Rosato Minchella on behalf of Home Depot, Inc. (Minchella, Anthony)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, Ascendium Education Group, Automatic Data Processing, Home Depot, Inc., filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Freberg, B)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, Home Depot, Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Ascendium Education Group, filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Pesta, J.)
September 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Allied Interstate to 10/1/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff's amended complaint (Doc. #14) is accepted for filing. Defendant shall file any answer or other response to the amended complaint by October 1, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/11/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/24/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Aiello on behalf of Allied Interstate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Aiello, Jacqueline)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Freberg, B)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINTS (Doc. #9, #10 and #11). Plaintiff has filed a series of three amended complaints. Each of these documents is different, and the Court is unclear which of the documents that plaintiff intends to serve as the operative complaint in this case. Moreover, one of the filed complaints (Doc. #11) appears to be missing at least one page of factual allegations. Plaintiff should review what she has filed, assemble a single document that contains all of her factual allegations and that includes any appended exhibits, and then file this document and any exhibits as her amended complaint not later than September 16, 2019. The Court notes that there is no requirement that plaintiff attach any exhibits or other evidence to her complaint, and plaintiff is advised that the attachment of exhibits is not a substitute for the requirement that plaintiff allege a plain and simple statement in the body of the complaint of the grounds for her causes of action in compliance with the Court's order to show cause (Doc. #8) and that describes what each named defendant did wrong that makes the named defendant liable to plaintiff. If plaintiff does not file a complaint that complies with the Court's order to show cause (Doc. #8), the Court is likely to dismiss this action. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/5/2019. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2019)(Freberg, B)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Freberg, B)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Freberg, B)
August 26, 2019 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2019; Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, filed by Mechonna Hagwood-EL.(Freberg, B)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff has filed a pro se complaint (Doc. #1) that alleges "unlawful wage garnishment" but that does not allege any other facts to support this claim. In accordance with Rule 8(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a federal civil complaint should contain a short and plain statement of facts to show that a plaintiff is entitled to relief. A complaint ordinarily sets forth statements identifying each of the parties, the nature of their relationship, the specific acts by specific persons that occurred which plaintiff believes is unlawful, the specific or approximate dates that such actions occurred, and a statement of the relief sought. The complaint should allege sufficient facts to put defendants on fair notice of what plaintiff claims they did wrong and to allege facts that satisfy each of the elements of any claimed violation of the law. The complaint must also include in its caption the name of any person, company, or other entity who is a defendant. The Court will permit plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 21 days by September 16, 2019, that sets forth proper factual allegations to support plaintiff's claim. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint by that date, it is likely that the Court will dismiss this action. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to plaintiff. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/26/2019. (Freberg, B)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Summons Issued, #2 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Mechonna Hagwood, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Mechonna Hagwood Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Allied Interstate* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Mechonna Hagwood* *95 Clinton Street* *Waterbury, CT 06710*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2019 Discovery due by 2/22/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2020 Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to Electronic Notice by Mechonna Hagwood (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 In Person Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Allied Interstate. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Filing fee received from Mechonna Hagwood: $ 400.00, receipt number 153375 (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate, filed by Mechonna Hagwood.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagwood-EL v. Allied Interstate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Interstate
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Rosato Minchella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Data Processing
Represented By: James F. Shea
Represented By: Russell Nicholas Jarem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendium Education Group
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechonna Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechonna Hagwood-EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?