Mamadjonova et al v. Barr et al
Defendant: Acting Fld Off Dir Todd Lyons, AG William Barr and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov and Madina S. Mamadjonova
Respondent: Todd Lyons, Department of Homeland Security and William Barr
Case Number: 3:2019cv01317
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint,,, by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Field Offices)(Copeland, Gregory)
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Paul Copeland on behalf of Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova (Copeland, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO 15 Order to Show Cause,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Reopen (Jan 2018), #2 Exhibit B - Amended Motion to Reopen (March 2018), #3 Exhibit C - BIA Decision (May 2018), #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Reopen (June 2018))(Larson, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Amended Verified Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus against William Barr, Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, filed by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mamadjonova Decl., #2 Exhibit Town of East Windsor Fire Report, #3 Exhibit December 22, 2017 Department of Justice Press Release, #4 Exhibit I-130 Petition Approval, #5 Exhibit BIA Decision September 13, 2019, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Petitioner, #7 Exhibit Third Circuit Order, #8 Exhibit Certificates of Birth for Petitioners' Children, #9 Exhibit Certificate of Marriage, #10 Exhibit Family Photos, #11 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #12 Exhibit Provisional Waiver Information Sheet)(Gillman, Sarah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: motion hearing teleconference held on 9/11/2019 re #17 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Government will show cause as to venue and jurisdiction by 9/27/2019 and petitioners will have fourteen days to respond. Total Time: 25 minutes. (Court Reporter L. Pipech, ECRO.) (Shafer, J.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #17 Motion for TRO. The Court also denies Petitioner's Oral Motion for Notice to Counsel of Transfer or Movement of Petitioner within the United States. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/11/2019. (Nault, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn McConaghy on behalf of William Barr, Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons (McConaghy, Michelle)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for teleconference. The Court schedules a Telephonic Conference for 09/11/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant to discuss Petitioners' #17 Second Motion for TRO to Prevent Imminent Removal. The parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/10/2019. (Nault, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to PREVENT IMMINENT REMOVAL by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Gillman, Sarah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Larson on behalf of William Barr, Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons (Larson, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Petition for Habeas Corpus. The Government is Ordered to Show Cause by 09/27/2019 why Petitioner's #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus and #2 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/06/2019. (Nault, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Additional Authority Corrected Document Being Filed in Place of ECF No. 12 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Gillman, Sarah)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Court's Order (ECF No. 7) filed by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Gillman, Sarah)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Additional Authority re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Gillman, Sarah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Telo Gillman on behalf of Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova (Gillman, Sarah)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Attorney Sarah T. Gillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/2/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah T. Gillman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Blank, Diana)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING without prejudice to refilling #6 Motion for Attorney Sarah T. Gillman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Local Rule 83.1(d)(1) states the affidavit must contain "the proposed visiting attorney's office address, telephone number, fax number, and e-mail address...." The affidavit currently does not make clear the telephone, email address, and fax number. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/30/2019. (Nault, James)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Petitioners are hereby Ordered to inform the Court as to the location of Petitioner Madjitov's current detention and which organization and where is Petitioner Madjitov's pending Motion to Reopen his Immigration Proceedings being adjudicated by 09/05/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/29/2019. (Nault, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah T. Gillman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5418506) by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova. (Blank, Diana)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov, Madina S. Mamadjonova re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,. (Blank, Diana)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/26/2019. (Velez, F.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/26/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 8/27/2019 to correct date (Velez, F.).
August 26, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for TRO, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Madina S. Mamadjonova, Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov. Responses due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of TRO-PI, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for TRO-PI)(Blank, Diana) Modified text and events on 8/27/2019 (Anastasio, F.). Modified on 8/27/2019 to add a filer (Reis, Julia).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ACTDC-5413531.), filed by Madina S. Mamadjonova, Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioner Mamadjonova Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Town of East Windsor Fire Report, #3 Exhibit Department of Justice Press Release, #4 Exhibit Motion to Reopen, #5 Exhibit Denial of Stay, #6 Exhibit I-130 Petition, #7 Exhibit Petitioner Madjitov Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Birth Certificates of U.S. CItizen Children, #9 Exhibit Marriage Certificate, #10 Exhibit Family Photos, #11 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #12 Exhibit Provisional Unlawful Presence Waivers, #13 Exhibit Third Circuit Stay of Removal)(Blank, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mamadjonova et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bakhodir Sabitovich Madjitov
Represented By: Diana R Blank
Represented By: Gregory Paul Copeland
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Madina S. Mamadjonova
Represented By: Diana R Blank
Represented By: Gregory Paul Copeland
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Fld Off Dir Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Represented By: John W. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Represented By: John W. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Represented By: John W. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?