Villegas v. Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Plaintiff: Priscilla Villegas
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv01331
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. On October 24, 2019, the Court discussed the scheduling of a settlement conference in this matter in conjunction with the referral for settlement entered in Colon v. Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, No. 19CV1333(KAD). In light of those discussions, the telephonic scheduling conference set for October 30, 2019, at 4:30PM (Doc. #19) is CANCELED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/24/2019. (Katz, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Pre-Settlement Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/24/2019. 5 minutes. (Katz, S.)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management Plan Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2019. Discovery due by 5/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2020. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Trial Brief due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/23/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019, at 4:30PM, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on 10/30/2019, at 4:30PM. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires all named parties and any other persons necessary to achieve full settlement (such as insurance representatives) to attend the settlement conference in person. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients and other necessary parties prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 180 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the conference to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. (Katz, S.)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for settlement conference SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/2019.(Lewis, D)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bovee, Tanya)
October 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center to 11/6/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. However defense counsel should expect no further extensions of this deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/8/2019. (Lewis, D) Modified on 10/8/2019 (Lewis, D).
October 7, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/15/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Bovee, Tanya)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Ann Bovee on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Bovee, Tanya)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Priscilla Villegas. (Carnabuci, Andrew)
September 19, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center to 10/7/2019. (Lewis, D)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 7, 2019, on Consent, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/19/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 7, 2019, on Consent, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals) (Reis, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/29/2019. (Reis, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/29/2019. (Reis, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/29/2019. (Reis, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2019 Discovery due by 2/28/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020 Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 7, 2019, on Consent, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice of No Pending Motions (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Salazar-Austin on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center from Connecticut Superior Court, case number HHD-CV19-6115312-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5418078, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center.(Salazar-Austin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villegas v. Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Represented By: David C. Salazar-Austin
Represented By: Tanya Ann Bovee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Villegas
Represented By: Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?