Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc v. Scorpo et al
Plaintiff: Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc
Defendant: Antonia Lentini, Locust Motors LLC, VEB Auto Sales LLC, Aftermath Stripes, LLC, Salvatore Liuzzo Scorpo, Chris Derrick, Albert Sejdiu, Amy Marques, Stephen James Katuzney, Jr., Fatos Statovci, Cars On Main LLC, Jeff Murphy, Ann Lentini, Amel Duric and Lidia Delmonaco
Case Number: 3:2019cv01345
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 11/27/2019 to File Response/Reply re #29 MOTION for More Definite Statement, and to 11/12/2019 to file a response to #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement until November 12, 2019 and November 27, 2019 by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion)(Musacchio, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Stephen James Katuzney, Jr. on October 08, 2019, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying without prejudice #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for failure to comply with the good cause standard of Local Rule 7. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement until November 12, 2019 and November 27, 2019 by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion)(Musacchio, John)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Stephen James Katuzney, Jr.Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for More Definite Statement)(Broder, Matthew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Broder on behalf of Stephen James Katuzney, Jr (Broder, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Nunc pro tunc Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/30/2019 to File Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/11/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 30, 2019 to File Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit in Support of Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Extension of Time)(Musacchio, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER request extend deadline to file Civil RICO Case Statement by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Aftermath Stripes, LLC on 9/28/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Cars On Main LLC, Fatos Statovci.(Donnelly, Jeremy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeff Murphy d/b/a Custom Stripe on 9/17/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chris Derrick on 9/21/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amy Marques on 9/21/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on VEB Auto Sales LLC on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Locust Motors LLC on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lidia Delmonaco on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Fatos Statovci on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cars on Main LLC on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amel Duric on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Albert Sejdiu on 9/18/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Salvatore Liuzzo Scorpo f/k/a Salvatore Kroemer on 9/17/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Antonia Lentini aka Ann Lentini on 9/17/19, filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement Request three (3) week extension to respond until 11/12/19 by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc. (Musacchio, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Lidia Delmonaco.Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Dean, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. Dean on behalf of Lidia Delmonaco (Dean, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Donnelly on behalf of Cars On Main LLC, Fatos Statovci (Donnelly, Jeremy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aftermath Stripes, LLC, Cars On Main LLC, Lidia Delmonaco, Chris Derrick, Amel Duric, Stephen James Katuzney, Jr, Antonia Lentini, Locust Motors LLC, Amy Marques, Jeff Murphy, Salvatore Liuzzo Scorpo, Albert Sejdiu, Fatos Statovci, VEB Auto Sales LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Anthony Musacchio, Towne Ryan & Partners, P.C.* *450 New Karner Road* *P.O. Box 15072* *Albany, NY 12212*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
September 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Musacchio, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/30/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/30/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2019. Discovery due by 2/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 30, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5419911.), filed by AUTO WORLD AUTOMOTIVE SUPERSTORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Musacchio, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc v. Scorpo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locust Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEB Auto Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aftermath Stripes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Liuzzo Scorpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Sejdiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen James Katuzney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatos Statovci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cars On Main LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amel Duric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidia Delmonaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto World Automotive Superstores, Inc
Represented By: John Anthony Musacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?