In re: O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc., et al.
Defendant: Nustar Terminals Marine Services, N.V.
In Re: O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc., O.W. Bunker USA Inc. and O.W. Bunker North America, Inc
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
Appellant: O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust
Appellee: Nustar Energy Services, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01366
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties filed a #7 stipulated notice of dismissal as to the appeal and the cross-appeal. This notice is proper under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023. The case is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/2/2019. (Ram, Megha)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023 by O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc., O.W. Bunker North America, Inc, O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust, O.W. Bunker USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wright, Davis)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY CROSS APPEAL by Nustar Energy Services, Inc, Nustar Terminals Marine Services, N.V. (Fanelle, N.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/4/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/4/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 14-51720, filed by O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum #1682, #2 Judgment #1683)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: O.W. Bunker USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: O.W. Bunker North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Natalie D. Ramsey
Represented By: Davis Lee Wright
Represented By: Patrick M. Birney
Represented By: Michael R. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nustar Terminals Marine Services, N.V.
Represented By: Michael M. Parker
Represented By: Eric Alexander Henzy
Represented By: Steve A. Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nustar Energy Services, Inc
Represented By: Michael M. Parker
Represented By: Eric Alexander Henzy
Represented By: Steve A. Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?