Jenkins et al v. Western Connecticut Mental Health Network et al
Plaintiff: Clifton Powell and Marlon Jenkins
Defendant: Amanda, Connecticut Valley Hospital, Western Connecticut Mental Health Network, Helen Vartelas, Tosha, Mahalingaiah Halevoor, Mobile Crisis, Rittmon Delphin Miriam, John Doe, Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services for Connecticut and Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv01371
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Order arresting and prosecuting employees of Connecticut Valley Hospital for reasons set forth in 21 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/27/2019. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #20 Plaintiffs Motion to have employees of the Connecticut Valley Hospital arrested and prosecuted at his request. The Constitution confines the judicial power of the federal courts to deciding cases or controversies within the scope of its jurisdiction. U.S. Const. art. III 2, cl. 1. The Court is not a prosecutorial agency of the Executive Branch. A private citizen lacks a judicially cognizable interest in the prosecution or nonprosecution of another Linda R.S. v. Richard D., 410 U.S. 614, 619 (1973). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/27/2019. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 Plaintiff Mr. Clifton Powell MOTION for a Court's Order That He Be Allowed to Have Employee's of Connecticut Valley Hospital Arrested and Prosecuted at His Request, by Clifton Powell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Plaintiff Mr. Clifton Powell Patient Account, by Clifton Powell. (Velez, F.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Financial Statement) (Velez, F.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #2 Envelope) (Velez, F.).
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff Mr. Clifton Powell Notice In Support of Previous Entry, by Clifton Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Number 06, #3 Envelope) (Velez, F.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Motion for Extension of Time until 05/21/2020 to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff states that there are 144 additional defendants to be named. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A), Plaintiff may amend his complaint once as a matter of course within 21 days after serving it. Plaintiff has not yet served the defendants and therefore may amend the complaint as a matter of course. Any motion to amend pleadings that requires leave of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) must also comply with Local Rule 7(f). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/24/2019. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT, by Clifton Powell. (Velez, F.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Clifton Powell. (Velez, F.) (Additional attachment(s) added to correct file date (Velez, F.).
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Notorious Criminal Gang Plot to Have the Court Extort Entitle Money So they Could Get it From a Third Party, by Clifton Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope). (Velez, F.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff, Clifton Powell's, First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Pleadings, until 5/21/2020, by Clifton Powell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Velez, F.)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Mr. Powell to either pay the filing fee or file Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis should he wish to proceed in this case. The prior Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 was filed only by Mr. Jenkins. For reasons set forth in the Courts 11 Order, Mr. Jenkins cannot file motions on behalf of Mr. Powell. The Court will provide Mr. Powell with thirty (30) days to comply with this Order. Failure to file a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of the case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Powell. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/13/2019. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Judgment as premature. None of the Defendants have appeared to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/12/2019. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #2 Mr. Jenkins's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum of decision. Mr. Jenkins's claims are dismissed sua sponte without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court is relieving Mr. Jenkins of the obligation to pay the filing fee in installments. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/12/2019. (Diamond, Matthew).
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT with redacted exhibit pursuant to Dkt. 8 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits with redaction) (Shafer, J.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER partially Sealing Exhibit I (26) of the Complaint #1 . To assure confidentiality established by federal law, the Clerk shall file a redacted complaint with the Social Security number obliterated and the balance of the Complaint #1 viewable as previously filed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/11/2019.(Diamond, Matthew).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2019; Discovery due by 3/5/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Judgment, by Clifton Powell. Responses due by 9/25/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Marlon Jenkins. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amanda, Connecticut Valley Hospital, Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services for Connecticut, John Doe, Mahalingaiah Halevoor, Rittmon Delphin Miriam, Mobile Crisis, Tosha, Helen Vartelas, Western Connecticut Mental Health Network,filed by Clifton Powell, Marlon Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, I, J and U) (Velez, F.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #2 Envelope) (Velez, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins et al v. Western Connecticut Mental Health Network et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Valley Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Connecticut Mental Health Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Vartelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahalingaiah Halevoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Crisis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rittmon Delphin Miriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services for Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?