USA v. $6,056.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $6,056.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jordan Jamison
Case Number: 3:2019cv01379
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 verified claim 2 ANSWER to Complaint by $6,056.00 in United States Currency, Jordan Jamison.(Thibodeau, Daniel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 verified claim ANSWER to #1 Complaint by $6,056.00 in United States Currency, Jordan Jamison.(Thibodeau, Daniel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Thibodeau on behalf of $6,056.00 in United States Currency, Jordan Jamison (Thibodeau, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Standing Protective Order, #4 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $6,056.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Nelson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $6,056.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,056.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jordan Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?