Dipippa v. Fulbrook Capital Mgmt. LLC et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Dipippa
Defendant: Selvn Seidel and Fulbrook Capital Mgmt. LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01386
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 URGENT MOTION for Relief by Selvn Seidel. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: MOTION. Held on 09/04/2019 before Judge KARI A. DOOLEY. Court Reporter: eScribers. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2019. (Gottlieb, J)
September 5, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Order to Shorten Time to Respond to Second Motion for Contempt Order by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
September 5, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Writ of execution regarding personal property against Selvyn Seidel by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
September 5, 2019 Filing 39 Second MOTION for Contempt by Anthony Dipippa.Responses due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Second Motion for Contempt)(Lowry, Houston)
September 4, 2019 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2019 re #35 MOTION filed by Selvn Seidel, #30 MOTION for Contempt for failure to comply with ruling on motion for order of compliance (#25) filed by Anthony Dipippa. Total Time: 1 hours and 32 minutes(Court Reporter S. Masse (AM) FTR (PM).) (Gould, K.)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record of the September 4, 2019 hearing, the Defendant, Mr. Seidel, shall produce documents responsive to the Plaintiff's previously served discovery requests by close of business on September 11, 2019 at Attorney Lowry's office. On September 16, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., Mr. Seidel shall appear at Attorney Lowry's office for a continued examination, as may be necessary. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/4/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition re #35 MOTION filed by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
September 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM *Location Change* Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Gould, K.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Relief by Selvn Seidel. Responses due by 9/24/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 34 Appearance Self Represented Party by Selvn Seidel. (Fanelle, N.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 33 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re #30 MOTION for Contempt for failure to comply with ruling on motion for order of compliance (#25) Signed By Houston Putnam Lowry filed by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
September 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM *Location Change* Judgment Debtor Exam set for 9/4/2019 10:00 AM in the second floor joint conference room. Parties may report to the Clerk's office, room 400, to be let into the conference room. (Gould, K.)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Dismiss attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/29/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Contempt for failure to comply with ruling on motion for order of compliance (#25) by Anthony Dipippa.Responses due by 9/19/2019 (Lowry, Houston)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
August 27, 2019 Filing 28 Docket Entry Correction re #27 MOTION to Dismiss. Replacement pdf. added, page 2 missing from original. (Fanelle, N.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Selvn Seidel . Responses due by 9/17/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Replacement pdf.) (Fanelle, N)
August 12, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for ruling on motion for order of compliance (Marshal appointed process server by #9) served on Selvyn Seidel on August 6, 2019, filed by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Order of Compliance. See attached Ruling and Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/2/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION for Compliance re: Disovery Order Signed By Houston Putnam Lowry filed by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Compliance re: Disovery Order by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 WRIT issued re: Application for Writs #20 & #21 . (Fanelle, N.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Writ of Financial Institution Execution re: Selvyn Seidel by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Writ of Financial Institution Execution re: Fulbrook Capital Management, LLC by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 WRIT of Financial Institution Execution Returned Executed - Partially Satisfied as to Selvyn Seidel. (Lowry, Houston)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 WRIT of Property Execution Returned as to Selvyn Seidel. (Lowry, Houston)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 WRIT of Property Execution Returned as to Fulbrook Capital Management LLC. (Lowry, Houston)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 WRIT of Post-Judgment Interrogatories Supplemental Return Returned as to Fulbrook Capital Management LLC. (Lowry, Houston)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 WRIT of Post-Judgment Interrogatories Supplemental Return Returned as to Selvyn Seidel. (Lowry, Houston)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 WRIT of Subpoena to Produce Documents Returned as to AC Manager LLC. (Lowry, Houston)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 WRIT of Subpoena to Produce Documents Returned as to Arrowhead Capital LLC. (Lowry, Houston)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 WRIT of Post-Judgment Interrogatories Returned as to Selvyn Seidel. (Lowry, Houston)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 WRIT of Post-Judgment Interrogatories Returned as to Fulbrook Capital Management LLC. (Lowry, Houston)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server Marshal John P. Corelli and Marshal Keith D. Niziankiewicz by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 WRIT issued re: Application for Writs #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 . (Fanelle, N.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of Property Execution re: Fulbrook Capital Management by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of Financial Institution Execution re: Fulbrook Capital Management by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Property Execution by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Writ of Financial Institution Execution by Anthony Dipippa. (Lowry, Houston)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/13/2019.(Bozek, M.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Putnam Lowry on behalf of Anthony Dipippa. (Bozek, M.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 Registration of Foreign Judgment from the Southern District of New York in favor of Anthony Dipippa against Fulbrook Capital Management, LLC and Selvn Seidel.( Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number CTXH00015345.), filed by Anthony Dipippa. (Attachments: #1 Default Judgment)(Bozek, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dipippa v. Fulbrook Capital Mgmt. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selvn Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulbrook Capital Mgmt. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dipippa
Represented By: Houston Putnam Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?