Caprio v. Gorawara
Plaintiff: John Caprio
Defendant: Wanling Su and Rahul Gorawara
Case Number: 3:2019cv01390
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Rahul Gorawara of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Motion for Order of Compliance, #2 Objection to Motion for Order of Compliance, #3 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Order of Compliance)(Gorawara, Rahul)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Rahul Gorawara Pursuant To Standing Order (Gorawara, Rahul)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/11/19.(Johnson, D.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Defendants' #1 notice of removal alleges that "[t]o prevent removal of his claims, the Plaintiff acted in bad faith by misleading the Defendants as to the amount in controversy." (ECF No. 1 at 1.) This seems to refer to the exception to the one-year time limit on removal described in 28 U.S.C. Secs. 1446(c)(1), (3)(B). The #1 notice of removal, however, does not provide any additional detail, nor does it cite to the 604-page state court record (ECF No. 2). The notice of removal thus does not provide adequate grounds for the Court to find that the plaintiff "deliberately failed to disclose the actual amount in controversy to prevent removal" under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1446(c)(3)(B). The Defendants are ordered to show cause within 7 days why this case should not be remanded to state court because more than one year has elapsed since the commencement of the suit, per 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1446(c)(1). Any response by Plaintiff will be due within 7 days of Defendants' response to this order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/11/2019. (Karpman, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The #5 motion to participate in electronic filing is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/11/2019. (Karpman, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Rahul Gorawara, #2 Exhibit filed by Rahul Gorawara, #3 Appearance Self Represented Party filed by Rahul Gorawara, #4 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Rahul Gorawara, #5 MOTION for filed by Rahul Gorawara, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/6/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/6/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2019. Discovery due by 3/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/6/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Rahul Gorawara. (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Electronic Notice by Rahul Gorawara (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Appearance Self Represented Party by Rahul Gorawara (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Filing fee received from Rahul Gorawara: $400, manual receipt number 783408 (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Rahul Gorawara re #1 Notice of Removal. (Reis, Julia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rahul Gorawara from State of Connecticut Superior Court, case number NNH-CV17-6071233-S and NHH-CV17-6004710-S, filed by Rahul Gorawara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia) Modified on 9/10/2019 to include second state court case number (Reis, Julia).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caprio v. Gorawara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanling Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Gorawara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caprio
Represented By: Richard F. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?