Floyd v. Blue Collar PEOS et al
Plaintiff: Louis Floyd
Defendant: Trevor Doyle and Blue Collar PEOS
Case Number: 3:2019cv01407
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Blue Collar PEOS to 11/22/2019; Trevor Doyle to 11/22/2019. See 12 Order. (Bozek, M.)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 consent motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond is hereby extended to and including November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/25/2019. (Sondergeld, C.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/22/2019 to respond to complaint by Blue Collar PEOS, Trevor Doyle. (Slossberg, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Nichols on behalf of Blue Collar PEOS, Trevor Doyle (Nichols, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Blue Collar PEOS, Trevor Doyle (Slossberg, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Floyd. Blue Collar PEOS served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Floyd. Trevor Doyle served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Trevor Doyle* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Paronich* *Paronich Law, P.C.* *350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400* *Hingham, MA 02043*. (Bozek, M.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Blue Collar PEOS* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Paronich* *Paronich Law, P.C.* *350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400* *Hingham, MA 02043*. (Bozek, M.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Louis Floyd, and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2019.(Bozek, M.)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/9/2019.(Bozek, M.)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2019.(Bozek, M.)
September 9, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Trevor Doyle. (Paronich, Anthony)
September 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Blue Collar PEOS. (Paronich, Anthony)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Collar PEOS, Trevor Doyle ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5432351.), filed by Louis Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Blue Collar PEOS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Collar PEOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Floyd
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?