Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Koch
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Paul R. Koch
Case Number: 3:2019cv01408
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting #10 Recommended Ruling. For the reasons explained in Judge Garfinkel's recommended ruling, the Court orders the case dismissed for lack of subject matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/8/2019. (Garcia, A.)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #20 Motion for Extension of Time. As the Court made clear in its previous #14 Order, the Court would grant no further extensions of time. The Court also notes that Plaintiff has raised similar arguments in previous motions for extensions of time. See Mot. for Extension of Time, ECF No. 12 (Oct. 7, 2019). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/8/2019. (Garcia, Angela)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #10 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul R. Koch by Paul R. Koch. (Fazekas, J.)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Due to a clerical error, the Order 15 and Recommended Ruling #10 is reissued to assure proper service. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 10/23/19.(Esposito, A.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding #14 Motion to Vacate MOOT. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/11/2019. (Garcia, Angela)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding #13 Motion MOOT. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/11/2019. (Garcia, Angela)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul R. Koch 6 Pages. Responses due by 11/6/2019. (Garcia, Angela)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has until November 6, 2019 to respond to the Recommended Ruling. Given the underlying nature of the matter and the serious concerns regarding subject matter jurisdiction, this is the only extension of time that the Court will grant. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/10/2019. (Garcia, Angela)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Vacate #10 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Notice of Removal, and Request to Grant #12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/6/2019 re: #10 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul R. Koch. (Fazekas, J.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Suspend Time Requirements to Plead by Paul R. Koch.Responses due by 10/29/2019 (Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/6/2019 to Respond to #10 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul R. Koch 6 Pages. by Paul R. Koch. (Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re #10 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul R. Koch 6 Pages. by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Picard, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 RECOMMENDED RULING: for the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objections must be filed within 14 days after service. 6 pages. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 9/18/19.(Esposito, A.)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis based upon the financial affidavit provided, but for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 9/18/19. (Esposito, A.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Picard, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Picard on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Picard, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/16/2019.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Garcia, Angela)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/10/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/10/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2019 Discovery due by 3/11/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020 Signed by Clerk on 9/10/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul R. Koch. (Oliver, T.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paul R. Koch from CT Superior Court Housing Division of the Judicial District of Bridgeport at Norwalk, case number NWH-CV-19-6005016-S., filed by Paul R. Koch. (Attachments: #1 Copy of State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Copy of Superior Court Case Look-up, #3 Copy of Summons Summary Process, #4 Copy of Summary Process Complaint, #5 Copy of Appearance) (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Jason
Represented By: Christopher J. Picard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?