Alpine Securities Corporation et al v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Alpine Securities Corporation and Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation
Defendant: Howard Rothman, Vision Financial Markets, LLC and Randall Jones
Case Number: 3:2019cv01425
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Howard Rothman to 11/22/2019; Vision Financial Markets, LLC to 11/22/2019. (Freberg, B)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2019 to Respond to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/10/2019. (Freberg, B)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2019, CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS VISION FINANCIAL MARKETS, LLC AND HOWARD ROTHMAN TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #1 Complaint by Randall Jones, Howard Rothman, Vision Financial Markets, LLC. (Chou, Jenny)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny R. Chou on behalf of Randall Jones, Howard Rothman, Vision Financial Markets, LLC NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JENNY CHOU (Chou, Jenny)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Randall Jones waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed by Alpine Securities Corporation ; Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation. (Spears, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alpine Securities Corporation. Howard Rothman served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019; Vision Financial Markets, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Spears, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Scottsdale Capital Advisors Holdings LLC for Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation. (Spears, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alpine Securities Corporation identifying Corporate Parent SCA Clearing LLC for Alpine Securities Corporation. (Spears, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Randall Jones, Howard Rothman, Vision Financial Markets, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian E. Spears* *Spears Manning & Martini LLC* *2425 Post Road Ste 203* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Spears, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Alpine Securities Corporation, Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2019.(Freberg, B)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/11/2019.(Freberg, B)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/11/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2019; Discovery due by 3/12/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 11, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5435559.), filed by Alpine Securities Corporation, Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Spears, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpine Securities Corporation et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Rothman
Represented By: Jenny R. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Financial Markets, LLC
Represented By: Jenny R. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Jones
Represented By: Jenny R. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpine Securities Corporation
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?