Geery v. Genesee & Wyoming Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Geery
Defendant: Richard H. Bott, Cynthia L. Hostetler, Hunter C. Smith, Genesee & Wyoming Inc., Mark A. Scudder, Albert J. Neupaver, Bruce J. Carter, ivind Lorentzen, III, Ann N. Reese, John C. Hellmann and Joseph H. Pyne
Case Number: 3:2019cv01438
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party in light of the Plaintiff's #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/07/2019. (Nault, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by John Geery (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hunter C. Smith waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark A. Scudder waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ann N. Reese waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph H. Pyne waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Albert J. Neupaver waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ivind Lorentzen, III waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cynthia L. Hostetler waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John C. Hellmann waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Genesee & Wyoming Inc. waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bruce J. Carter waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard H. Bott waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 filed by John Geery. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Richard H. Bott, Bruce J. Carter, Genesee & Wyoming Inc., John C. Hellmann, Cynthia L. Hostetler, ivind Lorentzen, III, Albert J. Neupaver, Joseph H. Pyne, Ann N. Reese, Mark A. Scudder, Hunter C. Smith* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shannon L. Hopkins* *Levi & Korsinsky, LLP* *1111 Summer Street, Suite 403* *Stamford, CT 06905*. (Shafer, J.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 9/13/2019. (Shafer, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/12/2019. (Shafer, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/12/2019. (Shafer, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/12/2019. (Shafer, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/11/2019; Discovery due by 3/13/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2019. (Shafer, J.)
September 12, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
September 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5438343.), filed by John Geery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hopkins, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geery v. Genesee & Wyoming Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Bott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee & Wyoming Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Scudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J. Neupaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce J. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ivind Lorentzen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann N. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Hellmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph H. Pyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Geery
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?