Community Association Underwriters of America v. Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters a/s/o Oxford Greens Association, Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01478
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc..(Gianquinto, Emily)
October 21, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc. to 11/18/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 18, 2019 to respond to #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 18, 2019 to respond to #1 Complaint by Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.. (Gianquinto, Emily)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. Gianquinto on behalf of Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc. (Gianquinto, Emily)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Association Underwriters of America. Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc. served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Donnelly, Derek)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C, P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Reis, Julia)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Community Association Underwriters of America, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2019. Discovery due by 3/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
September 20, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.. (Donnelly, Derek)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5449792.), filed by Community Association Underwriters of America.(Donnelly, Derek) Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Association Underwriters of America v. Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters a/s/o Oxford Greens Association, Inc.
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Sprinkler Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?