Eight Capital Management, LLC v. Eight Capital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Eight Capital Management, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Eight Capital Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01482
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eight Capital Corporation. (Shearin, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Megan Houlihan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5550240) by Eight Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven M. Wilker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5550218) by Eight Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue by Eight Capital Corporation.Responses due by 12/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Conrad Beyleveldt, #3 Declaration of Megan Houlihan, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Shearin, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Eight Capital Corporation (Shearin, James)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Regarding Service and Timing to Respond to Complaint by Eight Capital Management, LLC. (Barry, Jennifer)
October 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Eight Capital Corporation to 10/28/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Eight Capital Corporation on 10/7/2019, filed by Eight Capital Management, LLC. (Barry, Jennifer)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick C. Justman. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick C. Justman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5485220) by Eight Capital Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick C. Justman, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing)(Bengels, Jessica)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer L. Barry. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer L. Barry to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478399) by Eight Capital Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer L. Barry, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing)(Bengels, Jessica)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Does, Eight Capital Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica L Bengels* *Latham & Watkins-NY* *885 Third Ave., 53rd Fl, Suite 1000* *New York, NY 10022-4802*. (Fanelle, N.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Eight Capital Management, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eight Capital Management, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/23/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/23/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019 Discovery due by 3/24/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2020 Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 20, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eight Capital Management, LLC. (Bengels, Jessica)
September 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Does 1-10, Eight Capital Corporation. (Bengels, Jessica)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eight Capital Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5450309.), filed by Eight Capital Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bengels, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eight Capital Management, LLC v. Eight Capital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight Capital Corporation
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eight Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Jessica L Bengels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?