Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc. et al v. Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc., MD Erica J Kesselman and Erica J. Kesselman
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company, Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company F/K/A Darwin Select Insurance Company, Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company and Darwin Select Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01521
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the Parties' #28 Rule 26(f) Report. The Court has questions regarding the 26(f) Report and case management. A telephonic scheduling conference is scheduled for December 9, 2019 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/22/2019. (D'Amato, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc., Erica J. Kesselman. (McCormack, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc., Erica J. Kesselman. (McCormack, Michael)
November 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Simpson on behalf of Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Simpson, Richard)
November 19, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Ashmore on behalf of Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Ashmore, Kimberly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Gallinaro on behalf of Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Gallinaro, Jessica)
November 8, 2019 Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McCormack, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Gould, K.)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc. and Plaintiff Erica J. Kesselman shall file a reply to #18 MOTION to Dismiss and #19 MOTION to Dismiss by November 21, 2019. Defendants shall file a reply to any response by plaintiffs by December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/30/2019. (D'Amato, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc.. (McCormack, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #18 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/21/2019 by Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc., Erica J. Kesselman. (McCormack, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scarlett M. Rajbanshi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5477300) by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Spinelli, Dominic)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Jessica N. Gallinaro; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Kimberly A. Ashmore; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Richard A. Simpson. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard A. Simpson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5501914) by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit/Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Cert Good Standing)(Sheehan, Cristin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kimberly A. Ashmore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5501908) by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit/Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Cert Good Standing)(Sheehan, Cristin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica N. Gallinaro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5501888) by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration/Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing)(Sheehan, Cristin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company.Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MTD, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sheehan, Cristin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Steadfast Insurance Company.Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo ISO MTD)(Spinelli, Dominic)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael P. Duffy. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Duffy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5481168) by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spinelli, Dominic)
October 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company to 10/17/2019; Steadfast Insurance Company to 10/17/2019. (Gould, K.)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a response to the complaint by October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/10/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scarlett M. Rajbanshi Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scarlett M. Rajbanshi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5477300) by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spinelli, Dominic)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/17/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Sheehan, Cristin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Steadfast Insurance Company, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Steadfast Insurance Company, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, #10 Protective Order, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Fanelle, N.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Spinelli, Dominic)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominic Spinelli on behalf of Steadfast Insurance Company (Spinelli, Dominic)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019 Discovery due by 3/27/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020 Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
September 26, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, of Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Sheehan, Cristin) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parents for Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Sheehan, Cristin) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, of Pending Motions (Sheehan, Cristin) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristin E. Sheehan on behalf of Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Sheehan, Cristin) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company from Putnam Judicial District, case number WWM-CV19-6017974. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5458894, filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Sheehan, Cristin) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc. et al v. Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Dominic Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company F/K/A Darwin Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard A. Simpson
Represented By: Kimberly A. Ashmore
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Represented By: Jessica Gallinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darwin Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard A. Simpson
Represented By: Kimberly A. Ashmore
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Represented By: Jessica Gallinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Day Kimball Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Erica J Kesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica J. Kesselman
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?