Bergel v. Davis-Standard LLC
Plaintiff: Kyle Bergel
Defendant: Davis-Standard, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01524
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The parties have reported to chambers that this case has settled. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 3/2/2020. (Fries, J.)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The parties have reported that settlement discussions have continued and progressed. The parties are to report back on 2/28/2020 regarding continued discussions and if a final agreement has been reached. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 2/18/2020. (Fries, J.)
February 4, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Settlement Conference held on 2/4/2020. The parties have made significant progress towards settlement. By 2/18/2020 the parties will update Judge Richardson's chambers on the status of settlement discussions. Total Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes. (Fries, J.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A settlement conference is set for 2/4/2020 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 258, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Fries, J.)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 2/4/2020 at 1:00 PM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 12/19/2019. (Fries, J.)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #28 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall answer, object, or otherwise respond to defendant's First Request for Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Production of Documents dated November 26, 2019, by January 27, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/13/2019. (Clough, M.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 27, 2020 to Respond to Defendant's First Request for Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Kyle Bergel. (Wiktor, Magdalena)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant (ECF No. #25 ) is hereby GRANTED to January 27, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/11/2019. (Clough, M.)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Requests for Production (ECF No. #24 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. See ECF No. 25. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/11/2019. (Clough, M.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Davis-Standard, LLC. (Cannavino, Deborah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Requests for Production by Davis-Standard, LLC. (Cannavino, Deborah)
December 9, 2019 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: This case is hereby REFERRED to Judge Robert A. Richardson for a settlement conference. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/9/2019. (Clough, M.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STATUS REPORT: As set forth in the attached document, the parties shall file a joint status report by Tuesday, June 30, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/9/2019. (Clough, M.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (ECF No. #15 ) is hereby APPROVED. All discovery shall be completed by September 30, 2020. Dispositive motions shall be filed by November 30, 2020. All other dates requested in this report are also approved. The court will issue a trial memorandum order once the dispositive motions deadline has passed. REMINDER: please refer to the electronic filing order in civil cases re the requirements for submission of chambers copies. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/9/2019. (Clough, M.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin W. Thompson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/9/2019. Total time: 4 minutes. (Court Reporter Thompson, C.) (Clough, M.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Rachlis on behalf of Davis-Standard, LLC (Rachlis, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear for Attorney Stephen Rachlis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Rachlis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice re #14 (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5563566) by Davis-Standard, LLC.Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen Rachlis)(Cannavino, Deborah) Modified on 12/4/2019 to correct motion relief (Agati, Kathryn).
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Chambers will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. (Clough, M.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wiktor, Magdalena)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Rachlis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5563566) by Davis-Standard, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen Rachlis, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cannavino, Deborah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davis-Standard, LLC identifying Corporate Parents Davis-Standard Holdings Inc., DS Parent Inc., ONCAP III, and Onex Corporation. (Cannavino, Deborah) Modified on 11/5/2019 to include Corporate Parents in the Docket text (Ferguson, L.).
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Davis-Standard, LLC.(Cannavino, Deborah)
October 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Davis-Standard, LLC to 11/4/2019. (Ferguson, L.)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #10 ) is hereby GRANTED to November 4, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/16/2019. (Clough, M.)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Davis-Standard, LLC. (Cannavino, Deborah)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah DeHart Cannavino on behalf of Davis-Standard, LLC (Cannavino, Deborah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Bergel. Davis-Standard, LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Parenteau, Jacques)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Magdalena B. Wiktor on behalf of Kyle Bergel (Wiktor, Magdalena)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Davis-Standard, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jacques J. Parenteau* *Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-NL* *105 Huntington St., PO Box 1631* *New London, CT 06320*. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kyle Bergel, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2019, Discovery due by 3/28/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Davis-Standard, LLC. (Parenteau, Jacques)
September 27, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davis-Standard LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5459738.), filed by Kyle Bergel.(Parenteau, Jacques)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergel v. Davis-Standard LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Bergel
Represented By: Jacques J. Parenteau
Represented By: Magdalena B. Wiktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis-Standard, LLC
Represented By: Deborah DeHart Cannavino
Represented By: Stephen Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?