USA et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut and USA
Defendant: Circle of Life Transition Center, LLC and Valerie Williams
Case Number: 3:2019cv01537
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gutierrez, Y.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATED JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/14/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED JUDGMENT (Doc. #2 ). The Court APPROVES the parties' stipulated judgment and hereby ENTERS judgment in accordance with the terms of the stipulated judgment and the parties' settlement agreement. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/14/2019. (Mahler-Haug, A)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Settlement filed by USA. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2019.(Freberg, B)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/30/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/30/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2019; Discovery due by 3/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/30/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 30, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulated Judgment by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Exhibits to Settlement Agreement)(Thidemann, Anne)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Thidemann, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Karla A. Turekian
Represented By: Michael E. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Anne F. Thidemann
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle of Life Transition Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?