Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc v. Sisodia et al
Plaintiff: Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc
Defendant: Sami Yusuf, Samrat Sisodia and Sigma-Square Pharmaceutical Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01574
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fazekas, J.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc. (Schwartz, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order CANCELLED: Motion Hearing on #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy and #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for November 13, 2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/12/2019. (Leon, Noel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/12/2019. Total time: 4 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Leon, Noel)
November 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 2:00 PM. Telephonic Status Conference set for November 12, 2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
November 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for November 12, 2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' responses to #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy and #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction are now due November 8, 2019; and Plaintiff's reply is due by November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/31/2019. (Leon, Noel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Plaintiff's Application for Prejudgment Remedy until November 8, 2019 by Sigma-Square Pharmaceutical Solutions, LLC, Samrat Sisodia, Sami Yusuf. (Rueckert, Morgan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT ORDER granting #26 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/23/2019. (Perez, J.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Entry of Proposed Order on Consent by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kevin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Plaintiff's Application for Prejudgment Remedy, and #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction. Consistent with Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order, Plaintiff requests interim emergency relief before the scheduled hearing. As a result, the Court orders parties to submit proposed emergency relief language, by consent if possible, by October 22, 2019 at 5:00pm. Defendants' responses to #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy and #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction due November 1, 2019. Plaintiff's reply due by November 8, 2019.NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing on #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy and #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for November 13, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Leon, Noel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/18/2019. Total Time: 17 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Leon, Noel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Paul Rueckert on behalf of Sami Yusuf (Rueckert, Morgan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Sami Yusuf (O'Toole, Jill)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Klingman on behalf of Sigma-Square Pharmaceutical Solutions, LLC (Klingman, Patrick)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Disclosure Motion for Disclosure of Assets by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc. (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc re #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Plaintiff's Application for Prejudgment Remedy (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Plaintiff's Application for Prejudgment Remedy filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc. (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Plaintiff's Application for Prejudgment Remedy by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schwartz, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 10/18/19 at 11:00am. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 4:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Leon, Noel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Status Conference. A telephonic status conference will be set for 10/18/2019 at 11:00am. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/16/2019. (Leon, Noel)
October 16, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2019 (Perez, J.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Nolan Guarnieri on behalf of Samrat Sisodia (Guarnieri, Cody)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Telephonic Conference by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc. (Brown, Kevin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sigma-Square Pharmaceutical Solutions, LLC, Samrat Sisodia, Sami Yusuf* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin C. Brown* *Day Pitney LLP* *One Stamford Plaza, 263 Tresser Blvd.* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Fazekas, J.)
October 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Brown, Kevin)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to determine whether Defendant is represented by counsel and, if so, to seek by motion a telephonic status conference with the Court regarding Plaintiffs' pending motions, at a time convenient for both parties. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/2019. (Leon, Noel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin C. Brown on behalf of Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc, #8 Standing Protective Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Schwartz on behalf of Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/6/2019. Discovery due by 4/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/12/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction by Breckenridge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Daniel L. Schwartz, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Schwartz, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Breckenridge. (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Brown on behalf of Breckenridge (Brown, Kevin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwartz on behalf of Breckenridge (Schwartz, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Sigma-Square Pharmaceutical Solutions, LLC, Samrat Sisodia, Sami Yusuf ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5473318.), filed by Breckenridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B., #3 Exhibit C., #4 Exhibit D., #5 Exhibit E., #6 Exhibit F.)(Schwartz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc v. Sisodia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami Yusuf
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Morgan Paul Rueckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samrat Sisodia
Represented By: Cody Nolan Guarnieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma-Square Pharmaceutical Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Klingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breckenridge Pharmaceutical Inc
Represented By: Kevin C. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?