Lancaster et al v. Ecuadorian Investment Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Paola Canas, Sandra Valencia, Carissa Rosario, Claudia Sampedro, Sara Underwood, Mariana Davalos, Dessie Mitcheson, Tiffany Toth Gray, Ursula Mayes, Jessica Burciaga, Rosie Jones, Vida Guerra, Jessica Hinton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jennifer Zharinova, Eva Pepaj, Amber Lancaster, Cielo Jean Gibson, Lina Posada, Lucy Pinder, Irina Voronina and Iesha Marie Crespo
Defendant: Ecuadorian Investment Corp., Paul R. Matute and Wilfredo Matute
Case Number: 3:2019cv01581
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariana Davalos, Rosie Jones, Claudia Sampedro, Lina Posada, Andra Cheri Moreland, Sandra Valencia, Amber Lancaster, Vida Guerra, Ursula Mayes, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Sara Underwood, Eva Pepaj, Jennifer Zharinova, Irina Voronina, Paola Canas, Dessie Mitcheson, Jessica Burciaga, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario. Paul R. Matute served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Radshaw, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariana Davalos, Rosie Jones, Claudia Sampedro, Lina Posada, Andra Cheri Moreland, Sandra Valencia, Amber Lancaster, Vida Guerra, Ursula Mayes, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Sara Underwood, Eva Pepaj, Jennifer Zharinova, Irina Voronina, Paola Canas, Dessie Mitcheson, Jessica Burciaga, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario. Wilfredo Matute served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Radshaw, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariana Davalos, Rosie Jones, Claudia Sampedro, Lina Posada, Andra Cheri Moreland, Sandra Valencia, Amber Lancaster, Vida Guerra, Ursula Mayes, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Sara Underwood, Eva Pepaj, Jennifer Zharinova, Irina Voronina, Paola Canas, Dessie Mitcheson, Jessica Burciaga, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario. Ecuadorian Investment Corp. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Radshaw, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Freberg, B)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ecuadorian Investment Corp., Paul R. Matute, Wilfredo Matute* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street* *Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Freberg, B)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Sara Underwood, Claudia Sampedro, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Carissa Rosario, Ursula Mayes, Lina Posada, Jessica Hinton, Amber Lancaster, Paola Canas, Sandra Valencia, Lucy Pinder, Eva Pepaj, Rosie Jones, Dessie Mitcheson, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jennifer Zharinova, Mariana Davalos, Iesha Marie Crespo, Vida Guerra, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Toth Gray, Jessica Burciaga, Cielo Jean Gibson, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019. (Freberg, B)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/8/2019.(Freberg, B) (Reis, Julia).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/8/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2019; Discovery due by 4/8/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019. (Freberg, B)
October 8, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Paul R. Matute. (Radshaw, John)
October 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Wilfredo Matute. (Radshaw, John)
October 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ecuadorian Investment Corp.. (Radshaw, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5475410.), filed by Mariana Davalos, Rosie Jones, Claudia Sampedro, Lina Posada, Andra Cheri Moreland, Sandra Valencia, Amber Lancaster, Vida Guerra, Ursula Mayes, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Sara Underwood, Eva Pepaj, Jennifer Zharinova, Irina Voronina, Paola Canas, Dessie Mitcheson, Jessica Burciaga, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster et al v. Ecuadorian Investment Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valencia
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Rosario
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Jones
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Guerra
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zharinova
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Lancaster
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iesha Marie Crespo
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecuadorian Investment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Matute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfredo Matute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?