Preston v. Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan L Preston
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01590
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald S. Sack on behalf of Susan L Preston (Sack, Gerald)
October 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/23/2019 (Perez, J.)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until December 23, 2019 to file a 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/18/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 23, 2019 to file a 26(f) report by Mesa Airlines, Inc.. (Driscoll, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2019. Discovery due by 4/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Walker, J.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mesa Airlines, Inc. already filed in state court at time of removal.(Walker, J.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express. (Driscoll, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express from CT Superior Court, Hartford, case number HHD-CV18-6103880-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCTDC-5477445, filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Def's Answer, #3 Exhibit Pl's Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Pl's Response to Def's Notice to Admit)(Driscoll, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston v. Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan L Preston
Represented By: William P. O'Brien
Represented By: Gerald S. Sack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?