Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A. et al v. Netflix Inc. Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by the Panama-based law firm at the center of the leaked documents known as the Panama Papers against Netflix concerning the depiction of the law firm in the film “The Laundromat.”

Plaintiff: RAMON FONSECA, Bufete MF & CO., JURGEN MOSSACK and MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01618
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 First Memorandum in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bufete MF & Co., Ramon Fonseca, Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A.. (Seeger, Stephan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected as to Parties against Netflix Inc., filed by Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Jurgen Mossack, Bufete MF & Co..(Seeger, Stephan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Jurgen Mossack, Bufete MF & Co..(Seeger, Stephan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re 6 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , 5 First EXPARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kate Chilton, # 2 Declaration of Christian Davin, # 3 Declaration of Tom J. Ferber, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Healy, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Adelman, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5487972) by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Adelman, Esq.)(Healy, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tom J. Ferber, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5487967) by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Tom Ferber, Esq.)(Healy, James)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: As set forth at the telephonic conference held on October 16, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 9 by 12:00 p.m. on October 17, 2019. Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by 5:00 p.m. on October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/16/19. (Gutierrez, A.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Netflix Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephan Erich Seeger* *810 Bedford Street, Suite #3* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint, filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 5 First EXPARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 6 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Proposed Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 7 Notice (Other) filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Netflix Inc., 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Netflix Inc., 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Netflix Inc., 12 Electronic Filing Order, 13 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netflix Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Netflix Inc. for Netflix Inc.. (Healy, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Netflix Inc..Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Kate Chilton in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Healy, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James John Healy on behalf of Netflix Inc. (Healy, James)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/15/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/15/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2019. Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 15, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 First NOTICE by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A. Pursuant to FRCP 65(b) (Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.. (Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 First EXPARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, Bufete MF & CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Arthur Ventura Jr.)(Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 First Memorandum in Support re 2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Arthur Ventura Jr.)(Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A..Responses due by 11/5/2019 (Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Arthur Ventura Jr.)(Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Parties. (Seeger, Stephan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Netflix Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5485136.), filed by MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, Bufete MF & CO..(Seeger, Stephan) Modified text to update parties 10/16/2019 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A. et al v. Netflix Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMON FONSECA
Represented By: Stephan Erich Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bufete MF & CO.
Represented By: Stephan Erich Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JURGEN MOSSACK
Represented By: Stephan Erich Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.
Represented By: Stephan Erich Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?