Howarth v. Kitchen Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Defendant: The Kitchen Company, Inc. and Kitchen Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01635
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Dominic J Squatrito
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 AO 121 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Case) (Pipech, L.)
November 12, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The plaintiff has personally represented to the Court that the case has settled. Therefore, the Court now orders that this case be dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal is without costs to either party. The Clerk is hereby directed to close this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/8/19.(Pike, C.)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Morgan Howarth, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2019. Discovery due by 4/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 16, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) against The Kitchen Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5487894.), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Proposed Summons for The Kitchen Company, Inc., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howarth v. Kitchen Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kitchen Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?