Ferrari v. Ford
Plaintiff: Joseph Ferrari
Defendant: Erin Ford
Case Number: 3:2019cv01647
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION re #5 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Joseph Ferrari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Friedler, Jonathan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Friedler on behalf of Joseph Ferrari (Friedler, Jonathan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Erin Ford, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Erin Ford, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Erin Ford, #4 Notice of Removal, filed by Erin Ford, #5 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Erin Ford, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 10/18/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019. Discovery due by 4/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2019. (Reis, Julia)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Party by Erin Ford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Scope of Employment)(McConaghy, Michelle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Erin Ford from State of Connecticut Superior Court Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-Cv19-6043255-S., filed by Erin Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Scope of Employment)(McConaghy, Michelle)
October 18, 2019 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Erin Ford of Statement Concerning Removal (McConaghy, Michelle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Erin Ford of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket)(McConaghy, Michelle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Erin Ford from State Of Connecticut Superior Court Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-CV14-6043255-S., filed by Erin Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Scope of Employment)(McConaghy, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrari v. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Ford
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ferrari
Represented By: Jonathan Friedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?