Liberty Bank v. Telford et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Bank
Defendant: George Davis Telford, Jr., George Telford, Jr. Family Trust, George Davis Telford and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01657
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by USA.(Dennis, W Damon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Pavlick on behalf of Liberty Bank (Pavlick, Kyle)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by W Damon Dennis on behalf of USA (Dennis, W Damon)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by USA, #1 Notice of Removal filed by USA, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by USA, #6 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/22/2019. (Peterson, M)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/22/2019. (Peterson, M)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2019. Discovery due by 4/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2019. (Peterson, M)
October 22, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by USA re #1 Notice of Removal of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Turbert, Julie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of USA (Turbert, Julie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USA from Middletown Superior Court, case number MMX-CV-19-6026390-S., filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint)(Turbert, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Bank v. Telford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Davis Telford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Telford, Jr. Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Davis Telford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: W Damon Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Bank
Represented By: Joseph V. Meaney, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle R. Pavlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?