WB Music Corp. et al v. 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, NU80's Music, LLC, Irish Intellect, Taco Tunes Inc., Redfoo, LLC, Turkey On Rye Music and WB Music Corp.
Defendant: Michael Miller, Gregory Maloney and 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01687
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #13 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by May 29, 2020, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by June 29, 2020, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by July 28, 2020. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by June 29, 2020, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on March 6, 2020 at 4:45 pm. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/16/2019. (Mahler-Haug, A)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Osterberg, Eric)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C., Gregory Maloney, Michael Miller.(Sheffy, A.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C.. (Sheffy, A.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Alan Sheffy on behalf of 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C., Gregory Maloney, Michael Miller (Sheffy, A.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taco Tunes Inc., Turkey On Rye Music, Eskaywhy Publishing, Redfoo, LLC, NU80's Music, LLC, Irish Intellect, WB Music Corp., Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc.. 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019; Gregory Maloney served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019; Michael Miller served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Osterberg, Eric)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C., Gregory Maloney, Michael Miller* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eric C. Osterberg* *Osterberg LLC* *83 Atlantic Avenue* *Boston, MA 02110*. (Freberg, B)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by NU80's Music, LLC, WB Music Corp., Taco Tunes Inc., Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Redfoo, LLC, Turkey On Rye Music, Irish Intellect, #6 Report on Copyright Form, #1 Complaint, filed by NU80's Music, LLC, WB Music Corp., Taco Tunes Inc., Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Redfoo, LLC, Turkey On Rye Music, Irish Intellect Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Freberg, B)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/27/2019; Discovery due by 4/28/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Irish Intellect, NU80's Music, LLC, Redfoo, LLC, Taco Tunes Inc., Turkey On Rye Music, WB Music Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for WB Music Corp.. (Osterberg, Eric)
October 28, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Osterberg, Eric)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5502702.), filed by Taco Tunes Inc., Turkey On Rye Music, Eskaywhy Publishing, Redfoo, LLC, NU80's Music, LLC, Irish Intellect, WB Music Corp., Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Osterberg, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Freberg, B).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corp. et al v. 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bleu Disque Music Co., Inc.
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eskaywhy Publishing
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NU80's Music, LLC
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish Intellect
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taco Tunes Inc.
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redfoo, LLC
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turkey On Rye Music
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Eric C. Osterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miller
Represented By: A. Alan Sheffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Maloney
Represented By: A. Alan Sheffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1678 MW Turnpike, L.L.C.
Represented By: A. Alan Sheffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?