Conrad et al v. US Bank National Association
Plaintiff: John W. Conrad and Elizabeth P. Conrad
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv01720
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for US Bank National Association. (Bizar, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #22 Notice of Interlocatory Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this case: 0 (Pesta, J.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF INTERLOCATORY APPEAL as to 18 Order on Motion to Stay by Elizabeth P. Conrad. (Freberg, B) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (Pesta, J.).
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by US Bank National Association re #16 Affidavit,,,,,,,,,,, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 19 Order, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Local Rule 12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FRCP 12, #2 Exhibit B - Local Rule 7)(Bizar, David)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiffs shall file any objection or other response to defendants' motion to dismiss by December 16, 2019. The Court is unlikely to grant an extension of time. It is so ordered.(Responses due by 12/16/2019) Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/26/2019.(Freberg, B)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE FAILURE TO FILE LOCAL RULE 12 NOTICE. Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss but has not separately filed the notice to self-represented litigants that is required under Local Rule 12 of the District of Connecticut's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant shall forthwith file such notice on the docket. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/26/2019.(Freberg, B)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY (Doc. #9). The Court DENIES plaintiffs' motion to stay for substantially the reasons stated in defendant's opposition memorandum. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/26/2019. (Freberg, B)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay filed by US Bank National Association. (Bizar, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Lynn Percy filed by US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Entries, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Item, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Item, #4 Exhibit 4 -State Court Docket Item, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Item, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Docket Item, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Docket Item, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Docket Item, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court Docket Item, #10 Exhibit 10 - State Court Docket Item, #11 Exhibit 11 - State Court Docket Item, #12 Exhibit 12 - State Court Docket Item, #13 Exhibit 13 - State Court Docket Item, #14 Exhibit 14 - State Court Docket Item, #15 Exhibit 15 - State Court Docket Item, #16 Exhibit 16 - State Court Docket Item, #17 Exhibit 17 - State Court Docket Item, #18 Exhibit 18 - State Court Docket Item, #19 Exhibit 19 - State Court Docket Item, #20 Exhibit 20 - State Court Docket Item, #21 Exhibit 21 - State Court Hearing Transcript, #22 Exhibit 22 - State Court Docket Item, #23 Exhibit 23 - State Court Docket Item, #24 Exhibit 24 - State Court Docket Item, #25 Exhibit 25 - State Court Docket Item, #26 Exhibit 26 - State Court Docket Item, #27 Exhibit 27 - State Court Docket Item, #28 Exhibit 28 - State Court Docket Item, #29 Exhibit 29 - State Court Docket Item, #30 Exhibit 30 - State Court Docket Item, #31 Exhibit 31 - State Court Docket Item, #32 Exhibit 32 - State Court Docket Item, #33 Exhibit 33 - State Court Docket Item, #34 Exhibit 34 - State Court Docket Item, #35 Exhibit 35 - State Court Docket Item, #36 Exhibit 36 - State Court Docket Item, #37 Exhibit 37 - State Court Docket Item, #38 Exhibit 38 - State Court Docket Item, #39 Exhibit 39 - State Court Docket Item, #40 Exhibit 40 - State Court Docket Item, #41 Exhibit 41 - State Court Docket Item, #42 Exhibit 42 - State Court Docket Item, #43 Exhibit 43 - State Court Docket Item, #44 Exhibit 44 - State Court Docket Item, #45 Exhibit 45 - State Court Docket Item, #46 Exhibit 46 - State Court Hearing Transcript, #47 Exhibit 47 - State Court Docket Item, #48 Exhibit 48 - State Court Docket Item, #49 Exhibit 49 - State Court Docket Item, #50 Exhibit 50 - State Court Docket Item, #51 Exhibit 51 - State Court Docket Item, #52 Exhibit 52 - State Court Docket Item, #53 Exhibit 53 - State Court Hearing Transcript, #54 Exhibit 54 - State Court Docket Item, #55 Exhibit 55 - State Court Docket Item, #56 Exhibit 56 - State Court Docket Item, #57 Exhibit 57- State Court Docket Entries, #58 Exhibit 58 - State Court Docket Entries, #59 Exhibit 59 - State Court Docket Entries, #60 Exhibit 60 - State Court Docket Item)(Bizar, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by US Bank National Association. (Bizar, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by US Bank National Association.Responses due by 12/16/2019 (Bizar, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bizar on behalf of US Bank National Association (Bizar, David)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/5/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/5/2019. (Freberg, B)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/5/2019. (Freberg, B)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Trial Proceedings by Elizabeth P. Conrad. (Freberg, B)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Elizabeth P. Conrad, John W. Conrad, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elizabeth P. Conrad, John W. Conrad, #3 MOTION for filed by Elizabeth P. Conrad, #4 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Elizabeth P. Conrad Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/31/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/31/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2019; Discovery due by 5/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2019.(Freberg, B)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Electronic Notice by Elizabeth P. Conrad (Freberg, B)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Elizabeth P. Conrad. (Freberg, B)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth P. Conrad, John W. Conrad. (Freberg, B) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Freberg, B).
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Bank National Association, filed by Elizabeth P. Conrad, John W. Conrad.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad et al v. US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth P. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: David M. Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?