Mitchel v. Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mitchel
Defendant: Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO and Hartford Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv01746
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO to 1/9/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED to January 9, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/2/2020. (Clough, M.)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 First Memorandum in Support re #14 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO. (Chester, Eric)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss by Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO.Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Chester, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hartford Board of Education. (Engler, Christopher)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Hartford Board of Education.Responses due by 1/17/2020 (Engler, Christopher)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Vacek Wilde on behalf of Hartford Board of Education (Wilde, Julia)
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Edward Engler on behalf of Hartford Board of Education (Engler, Christopher)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/09/2020 to file responsive pleading by Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO. (Chester, Eric)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Warren Chester on behalf of Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO (Chester, Eric)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive, Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Board of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive, Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 7, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO. (Pantuso, Anthony)
November 7, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Board of Education. (Pantuso, Anthony)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Cynthia Mitchel, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/6/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/6/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2020, Discovery due by 5/7/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5519184.), filed by Cynthia Mitchel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pantuso, Anthony)
November 6, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchel v. Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mitchel
Represented By: Anthony J. Pantuso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Federation of School Health Professionals Local 1018A/B, AFT, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Eric Warren Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Board of Education
Represented By: Christopher Edward Engler
Represented By: Julia Vacek Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?