Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida
Defendant: Michael Mcclellan, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Kare Schultz
Petitioner: Ramon Geraldino, HMG Global Initiative Inc., Ezra Erani, David Magana and Paul Huang
Respondent: Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board
Case Number: 3:2019cv01768
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 72 Memorandum in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-558; 17-cv-1938; 18-cv798; 18-cv-800 filed by HMG Global Initiative Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kathrein, Reed)
December 13, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-cv-558; 17-cv-1938; 18-cv798; 18-cv-800 by Michael Mcclellan, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd..Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ontario Teachers Joint Motion and Exhibits)(O'Toole, Jill)
December 13, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE re 67 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,, filed by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven B. Singer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5553798) by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #48 MOTION for Attorney(s) David R. Kaplan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5553730) by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying without prejudice #64 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg and #66 Motion to Appoint Counsel by HMG Global Initiative, Inc. These motions are denied without prejudice to refiling if this case is not consolidated with Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, et al. v. Teva Pharmaceutical Indus., Ltd., et al., 17-cv-558 (SRU). In Ontario Teachers', the parties' submissions regarding consolidation are due by December 13, 2019. See Case Management Order, Doc. No. 298, at 1. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/5/2019. (Rosenberg, J.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by HMG Global Initiative Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Izard, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed R Kathrein on behalf of HMG Global Initiative Inc. (Kathrein, Reed)
November 27, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Gilmore on behalf of HMG Global Initiative Inc. (Gilmore, Lucas)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Attorney Steven B. Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Attorney David R. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 60 Docket Entry Correction re #49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven B. Singer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5553798) MODIFIED TO ADD REPLACEMENT PDF TO THE DOCKET ENTRY (Oliver, T.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 59 Docket Entry Correction re #48 MOTION for Attorney(s) David R. Kaplan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5553730) MODIFIED TO ADD REPLACEMENT PDF TO THE DOCKET ENTRY (Oliver, T.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Attorney Reed R. Kathrein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Attorney(s) Reed R. Kathrein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5561242) by HMG Global Initiative Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Izard, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lucas E. Gilmore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5558340) by HMG Global Initiative Inc.. (Izard, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion Attorney Lucas E. Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lucas E. Gilmore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5558340) by HMG Global Initiative Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Izard, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/22/2019.(Jaiman, R.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Izard, Jr on behalf of HMG Global Initiative Inc. (Izard, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Raabe on behalf of HMG Global Initiative Inc. (Raabe, Craig)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF TRANSFER. In the interest of justice, the case is reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. All further pleadings or documents in this matter should be filed with the Clerk's Office in Bridgeport and bear the docket number 3:19-cv-01768-SRU. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/21/2019.(Pipech, L.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven B. Singer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5553798) by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Steven B. Singer)(Whitcomb, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #2 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.).
November 20, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) David R. Kaplan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5553730) by Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of David R. Kaplan)(Whitcomb, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #2 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.).
November 19, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Volpe on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida (Volpe, Christina)
November 19, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Whitcomb on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 44 Notice to counsel in transferred case: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Michael Mcclellan, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (O'Toole, Jill)
November 8, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 11/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/8/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2020. Discovery due by 5/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/19.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified signature on 11/13/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
November 8, 2019 Filing 38 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02711.
November 8, 2019 Original record transferred to the District of Connecticut via interdistrict transfer system. (md)
October 9, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Transfer filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. #24 ) IS GRANTED. HMG'S MOTION FOR LEAD PLAINTIFF AND TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. #14 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE REMAINING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS (DOC. NOS. #11 , #12 , AND #13 ) ARE TERMINATED. THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (DOC. NO. #35 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT AND SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/3/2019.10/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Scheduling of Briefing by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by HMG GLOBAL INITIATIVE INC. re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Transfer , #24 MOTION to Transfer Notice of Subsequent Event Related to Motions to Transfer the Action to the District of Connecticut (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(CARSON, SHANON)
September 27, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Transfer filed by ONTARIO TEACHER'S PENSION PLAN BOARD. (RASSIAS, DION)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Transfer Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by HMG GLOBAL INITIATIVE INC.. (CARSON, SHANON)
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #24 MOTION to Transfer , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. (KAPLAN, DAVID)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JASON D. FRANK, ESQ (DOC. 28) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/20/19. 9/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EMILY E. RENSHAW, ESQ. (DOC. 27) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/20/19. 9/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Jason D. Frank ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13799200.) filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Certificate of Service.(SONNENFELD, MARC) Modified on 9/17/2019 (md).
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Emily E. Renshaw ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13799146.) filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Certificate of Service.(SONNENFELD, MARC) Modified on 9/17/2019 (md).
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Transfer filed by HMG GLOBAL INITIATIVE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johanna M. Menendez)(CARSON, SHANON)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Transfer , #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs, #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD...(SONNENFELD, MARC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Transfer , #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs, #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit A)(KAPLAN, DAVID)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by PAUL HUANG re #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Non-Opposition (GIBSON, BARBARA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs, #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by HMG GLOBAL INITIATIVE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(CARSON, SHANON)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Transfer , #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs, #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by EZRA ERANI, DAVID MAGANA. (GOLDBERG, JACOB)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. KARE SCHULTZ waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (KAPLAN, DAVID)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. MICHAEL MCCLELLAN waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (KAPLAN, DAVID)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (KAPLAN, DAVID)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF REED KATHREIN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #15 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/27/2019. 8/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Reed Kathrein ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13759385.) filed by HMG GLOBAL INITIATIVE INC..(CARSON, SHANON) Modified on 8/28/2019 (nd, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Transfer filed by HMG GLOBAL INITIATIVE INC., Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion of HMG Global Initiative Inc. to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Approve Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, and Transfer the Action to the District of Connecticut, #2 Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of HMG Global Initiative Inc. to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Approve Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, and Transfer Action to the District of Connecticut, #3 Exhibit A (Certification), #4 Exhibit B (Loss Chart), #5 Exhibit C (Notice of Pendency), #6 Exhibit D (HBSS Resume), #7 Exhibit E (BM Resume), #8 Text of Proposed Order)(CARSON, SHANON) Modified on 8/28/2019 (md).
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by EZRA ERANI, DAVID MAGANA, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 of Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 of Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 of Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 of Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 of Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 of Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, JACOB) Modified on 8/28/2019 (md).
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration, #4 Ex. A: Notice of Pendency of Class Action, #5 Ex. B: Certification of St. Petersburg, #6 Ex. C: Loss Chart of St. Petersburg, #7 Ex. D: Saxena White Firm Resume, #8 Ex. E: Promisloff Law Firm Resume)(KAPLAN, DAVID)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs filed by RAMON GERALDINO, PAUL HUANG, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, BARBARA) Modified on 8/28/2019 (md).
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID R. KAPLAN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #9 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David R. Kaplan, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13707282.) filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA.Certificate of Service.(PROMISLOFF, DAVID)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JORDAN D. HERSHMAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/29/19. 7/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jordan D. Hershman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13698099.) filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Certificate of Service.(SONNENFELD, MARC)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REFER THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION TO THE CHIEF JUDGE OF THIS COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/23/19. 7/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Reassign Case Uncontested filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(SONNENFELD, MARC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. SONNENFELD on behalf of MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/26/19. 6/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT CLERK SHALL REMOVE THE RELATED CASE DESIGNATION AND REFER THE CASE TO THE CHIEF JUDGE FOR RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/25/19. 6/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 21, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.. Forwarded To: counsel on 6/24/19. (kw, )
June 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. (kw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE199283.), filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track)(kw, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2019) (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mcclellan
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Geraldino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HMG Global Initiative Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Lucas Gilmore
Represented By: Reed R Kathrein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ezra Erani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Magana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employees' Retirement System of the City of St. Petersburg, Florida
Represented By: Christina Volpe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?