CNC Software, Inc. v. Camatech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CNC Software, Inc.
Defendant: Camatech, Inc., Paul Culumovic and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv01771
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 AO 121 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by CNC Software, Inc. (McLane, Jodi-Ann)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Fazekas, J.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by CNC Software, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by CNC Software, Inc., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CNC Software, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020. Discovery due by 5/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 11, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNC Software, Inc.. (McLane, Jodi-Ann)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by CNC Software, Inc. re #1 Complaint Civil Action Cover Sheet (McLane, Jodi-Ann)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5534395.), filed by CNC Software, Inc..(McLane, Jodi-Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNC Software, Inc. v. Camatech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camatech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Culumovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNC Software, Inc.
Represented By: Jodi-Ann McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?